HART v. UNITED FARM FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE HART
Defendant: UNITED FARM FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE
Case Number: 1:2019cv03142
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan K. Bullock on behalf of Plaintiff STEPHANIE HART. (Bullock, Bryan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by UNITED FARM FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE.(Martin, Bonnie)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 12:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/11/2019.(JRB)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by STEPHANIE HART. UNITED FARM FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE served on 8/1/2019. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant UNITED FARM FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE. (Martin, Bonnie)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED FARM FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE identifying Corporate Parent Indiana Farm Bureau, Inc. for UNITED FARM FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE.. (Martin, Bonnie)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie L. Martin on behalf of Defendant UNITED FARM FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE. (Martin, Bonnie)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMB)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNITED FARM FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE. (TMB)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dutkanych, III on behalf of Plaintiff STEPHANIE HART. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED FARM FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE, filed by STEPHANIE HART. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5549023) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Dutkanych, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HART v. UNITED FARM FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE HART
Represented By: Andrew Dutkanych, III
Represented By: Bryan K. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED FARM FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY d/b/a INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE
Represented By: Bonnie L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?