EWING v. SAUL
Plaintiff: MEGAN N EWING
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION and ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2019cv03230
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Wierenga, Julian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE , re #3 Magistrate Judge's Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction, filed by Plaintiff MEGAN N EWING. (Murphy, David)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 2, 2019 (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) CLERK'S NOTICE - Pursuant to Local Rule 5-12(a), and by agreement with the United States Attorney, no actual service of initial process is required in Social Security appeals brought in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana, unless otherwise ordered. The Social Security Administration will treat notification through the Court's Case Management and Electronic Filing System (CM/ECF) as service under Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Therefore, the Clerk's Office will refrain from issuance of the submitted summons(es) unless otherwise ordered. (TEXT-ENTRY: There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (AKH)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David Porter Murphy on behalf of Plaintiff MEGAN N EWING. (Murphy, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by MEGAN N. EWING. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5558116) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Murphy, David) Modified on 8/2/2019 per phone call from attorney (DJH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EWING v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGAN N EWING
Represented By: David Porter Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?