EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Defendant: BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC. and BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03331
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendants' #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 11/1/2019. Additionally, the parties are reminded that S.D. Indiana Local Rule 6-1 requires motions for extension of time to be filed three (3) business days prior to the deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/3/2019. (SWM)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to November 1, 2019 in which to #1 Complaint Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendants BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mosby, Brian)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2019 02:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/6/2019.(SWM)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Brookdale Senior Living Inc. for BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC... (Mosby, Brian)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC.. (Mosby, Brian)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Lee Mosby on behalf of Defendants BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC.. (Mosby, Brian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREK, LLC, BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC. (REO)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Alessandra M. Rosa on behalf of Plaintiff EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (Rosa, Alessandra)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Rosa, Alessandra) Modified on 8/8/2019 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREK, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES, INC.
Represented By: Brian Lee Mosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOKDALE PLACE AT FALL CREEK, LLC
Represented By: Brian Lee Mosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Represented By: Alessandra M. Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?