PARROTT v. SAUL
Plaintiff: MICHAEL E. PARROTT
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2019cv03382
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Seagle on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Seagle, Catherine)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Wierenga, Julian)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Copy to AUSA via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/12/2019. (NAD)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL E. PARROTT. (Wold, Kirsten)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten Elaine Wold on behalf of Plaintiff MICHAEL E. PARROTT. (Wold, Kirsten)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by MICHAEL E. PARROTT. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wold, Kirsten)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARROTT v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL E. PARROTT
Represented By: Kirsten Elaine Wold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Represented By: Catherine Seagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?