KERSHNER v. CUMMINS, INC.
Plaintiff: DANIEL KERSHNER
Defendant: CUMMINS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03454
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
2 Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by CUMMINS, INC..(Beck, Jeffrey)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Jeffrey Scott Beck hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Beck, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Adriana Figueroa hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Figueroa, Adriana)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2019 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/4/2019.(SWM) Modified on 9/5/2019 to clarify that it is an in-person conference (AKW).
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant CUMMINS, INC.. (Beck, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana Figueroa on behalf of Defendant CUMMINS, INC.. (Figueroa, Adriana)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CUMMINS, INC.. (Beck, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Beck on behalf of Defendant CUMMINS, INC.. (Beck, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Judge James Patrick Hanlon is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-3454-SEB-DML, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/28/2019. (PKP)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by DANIEL KERSHNER. CUMMINS, INC. served on 8/19/2019. (Haskin, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CUMMINS, INC.. (AKH)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Mark Adams on behalf of Plaintiff DANIEL KERSHNER. (Adams, Samuel)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Haskin on behalf of Plaintiff DANIEL KERSHNER. (Haskin, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against CUMMINS, INC., filed by DANIEL KERSHNER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5579054) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haskin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KERSHNER v. CUMMINS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMMINS, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Beck
Represented By: Adriana Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL KERSHNER
Represented By: Samuel Mark Adams
Represented By: John H. Haskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?