DEBOARD v. URBAN STATION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DAVID DEBOARD
Defendant: URBAN STATION, LLC and H.M. MAC DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03488
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to H.M. MAC DEVELOPMENT, LLC, URBAN STATION, LLC. (NAD)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to H.M. MAC DEVELOPMENT, LLC, URBAN STATION, LLC. (Calhoun, Eric)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan R. Frasher on behalf of Plaintiff DAVID DEBOARD. (Frasher, Ryan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G. Calhoun on behalf of Plaintiff DAVID DEBOARD. (Calhoun, Eric)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5582171) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Calhoun, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEBOARD v. URBAN STATION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URBAN STATION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.M. MAC DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID DEBOARD
Represented By: Eric G. Calhoun
Represented By: Ryan R. Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?