ATKINS v. MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Plaintiff: KAYLA ATKINS
Defendant: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03581
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Defendant's #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 10/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/21/2019. (SWM)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/29/2019 , filed by Defendant MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seitz, Theodore)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. identifying Corporate Parent ENCORE CAPITAL GROUP, INC. for MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC... (Seitz, Theodore)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Parties First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Seitz, Theodore) Modified on 9/24/2019 (JDC).
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore W. Seitz on behalf of Defendant MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Seitz, Theodore)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service, filed by KAYLA ATKINS. MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. served on 9/3/2019. (Philipps, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff KAYLA ATKINS. (Philipps, Mary)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.. (AKH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff KAYLA ATKINS. (Steinkamp, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angie K. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff KAYLA ATKINS. (Robertson, Angie)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff KAYLA ATKINS. (Philipps, Mary)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff KAYLA ATKINS. (Philipps, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., filed by KAYLA ATKINS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5594990) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indiana Secretary of State Corporate Information, #2 Exhibit B - NMLS State License Information, #3 Exhibit C - Collection Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Collection Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATKINS v. MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAYLA ATKINS
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: Theodore W. Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?