FIELDS v. ZATECHY
Petitioner: JACONIAH FIELDS
Respondent: DUSHAN ZATECHY
Case Number: 1:2019cv03586
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIPT #IP066911 for habeas filing fee in the amount of $5.00, paid by petitioner. (AKH)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE, re #3 Order to Show Cause, filed by Petitioner JACONIAH FIELDS . (DWH) Modified on 9/26/2019 (DWH).
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by JACONIAH FIELDS. (DWH)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - FOR FILING FEE, SCREENING AND DISMISSING PETITION, AND DIRECTING PETITIONER TO SHOW CAUSE - Petitioner Jaconiah Fields shall pay the five dollar ($5.00) filing fee for this action no later than September 24, 2019, or demonstrate his financial inability to do so. Therefore, the petition for a writ of habeas corpus is dismissed. Mr. Fields shall have until September 24, 2019, in which to show cause why Final Judgment should not be entered and this action closed. The failure to respond to this Order or to show cause will result in Final Judgment being entered without further notice to Mr. Fields (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/28/2019. Copy to Petitioner via US Mail. (DWH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by JACONIAH FIELDS. (No fee paid with this filing) (DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIELDS v. ZATECHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DUSHAN ZATECHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JACONIAH FIELDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?