CATOE v. KIWI-TEK LLC
Plaintiff: DARLENE CATOE
Defendant: KIWI-TEK LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03627
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to KIWI-TEK LLC. (LAB) (JRB)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00485. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to transfer immediately Ms. Catoe's entire case file to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana, Indianapolis Division; and granting #11 motion for extension of time to file and serve responsive pleading. Kiwi-Tek, LLC shall have up to and including 30 days from the entry of this Order to file an answer or otherwise respond to Ms. Catoe's complaint. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/26/2019. (jbh) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/27/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 Motion to Change Venue From the Eastern District of Arkansas to the Southern District of Indiana, Indianapolis Division filed by Kiwi-Tek LLC. (Benson, Margaret) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/27/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Change Venue From the Eastern District of Arkansas to the Southern District of Indiana, Indianapolis Division by Kiwi-Tek LLC (Benson, Margaret) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/27/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File and Serve Responsive Pleading by Kiwi-Tek LLC (Benson, Margaret) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/27/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/15/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/29/2019; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 8/17/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 08/21/2019. (tmw) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/27/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Order of Recusal. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to #3 docket entry and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (cmn) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/27/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff Darlene Catoe's complaint. Kiwi-Tek, LLC shall have up to and including 8/26/2019, to file an answer or otherwise respond to Ms. Catoe's complaint. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/9/2019. (jbh) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/27/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (or Otherwise Respond) by Kiwi-Tek LLC (Benson, Margaret) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/27/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Hobbs Benson on behalf of Kiwi-Tek LLC (Benson, Margaret) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/27/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eva C. Madison on behalf of Kiwi-Tek LLC (Madison, Eva) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/27/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #3 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Kristine G. Baker. (jak) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/27/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/9/19. (mmb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn). [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/27/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT To Join Collective Action filed by Darlene Catoe. (ljb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/27/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against Kiwi-Tek LLC filed by Darlene Catoe. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT072989.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/27/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CATOE v. KIWI-TEK LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARLENE CATOE
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Represented By: Brandon M. Haubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIWI-TEK LLC
Represented By: Margaret Hobbs Benson
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?