WATSON v. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Plaintiff: ERNEST CHARLES WATSON, JR.
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03759
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by ERNEST CHARLES WATSON, JR. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC waiver sent on 9/17/2019. (Shea, Richard)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC. (AKH)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Shea, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff ERNEST CHARLES WATSON, JR. (Shea, Richard)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, filed by ERNEST CHARLES WATSON, JR. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5611823) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 The Loan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bankruptcy Docket, #3 Exhibit 3 Proof of Claim, #4 Exhibit 4 Notice of Final Cure, #5 Exhibit 5 Response to Notice of Final Cure, #6 Exhibit 6 - Watsons Proof of Payments, #7 Exhibit 7 Watsons Monthly Mortgage Statements, #8 Exhibit 8 Notice of Default Sent to Watson, #9 Exhibit 9 March 4, 2019 letter sent by Ocwen, #10 Exhibit 10 Escrow Account Disclosure Statement sent by Ocwen, #11 Exhibit 11 Notice of Servicing Transfer sent by Ocwen, #12 Exhibit 12 Final Escrow Account Disclosure Statement sent by Ocwen, #13 Exhibit 13 Copy of NOE #1, #14 Exhibit 14 Copy of Tracking Information for NOE #1, #15 Exhibit 15 Copy of RFI#1, #16 Exhibit 16 Copy of RFI#2, #17 Exhibit 17 Copy of Tracking Information for RFI#1, #18 Exhibit 18 Copy of Tracking Information for RFI#2, #19 Exhibit 19 Copy of RESPA Response, #20 Exhibit 20 Copy of NOE#2, #21 Exhibit 21 Copy of Tracking Information for NOE#2, #22 Exhibit 22 Group Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23 The April 18, 2019 Denial of Credit Letter, #24 Exhibit 24 Copies of Dispute Letters sent by Watson to Credit Reporting Agencies, #25 Exhibit 25 Copy of Tracking Information for TransUnion Dispute Letter, #26 Exhibit 26 Copy of Tracking Information of Experian Dispute Letter, #27 Exhibit 27 Copy of Equifax Dispute Letter, #28 Exhibit 28 Copy of Dispute Results from Experian, #29 Civil Cover Sheet, #30 Proposed Summons)(Shea, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WATSON v. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNEST CHARLES WATSON, JR.
Represented By: Richard John Shea, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?