TOOLEY v. CYPRESS GROUP LLC
Plaintiff: DENNIS TOOLEY
Defendant: CYPRESS GROUP LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03848
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by CYPRESS GROUP LLC.(Milkey, Scott)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/26/2019 03:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/1/2019.(SWM)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant CYPRESS GROUP LLC. (Milkey, Scott)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 MARGINAL ENTRY denying Defendant's #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint. Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(b), only a notice is required, not a motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/4/2019. (SWM)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia A. Bedrick on behalf of Defendant CYPRESS GROUP LLC. (Bedrick, Cynthia)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to November 8, 2019 in which to #1 Complaint (Respond to), filed by Defendant CYPRESS GROUP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Milkey, Scott)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Aaron Milkey on behalf of Defendant CYPRESS GROUP LLC. (Milkey, Scott)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jason Karmire on 09/19/2019, filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. (Mussman, Louis Ivan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CYPRESS GROUP LLC. (DJH)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C. Bohnet on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Bohnet, Eric)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Ivan Christopher Mussman on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Mussman, Louis Ivan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CYPRESS GROUP LLC, filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5622477) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Mussman, Louis Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOOLEY v. CYPRESS GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS TOOLEY
Represented By: Louis Ivan Christopher Mussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRESS GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?