RYBAK v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: GENNADIY RYBAK
Defendant: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY and RAYMOND MULLER
Case Number: 1:2019cv03852
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by GENNADIY RYBAK. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY waiver sent on 9/23/2019; RAYMOND MULLER waiver sent on 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Waiver for Lilly, #2 Exhibit B_Waiver for Muller, #3 Exhibit C_Signed Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Sture, Tae)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Actions, filed by Defendant ELI LILLY AND COMPANY (Boshkoff, Ellen)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela N. Johnson on behalf of Defendant ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Johnson, Angela)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen E. Boshkoff on behalf of Defendant ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Boshkoff, Ellen)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-3852-TWP-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker for all further proceedings. This case is related to 1:18-cv-1802-TWP-TAB. Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/13/2019. (TRG)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tae K. Sture on behalf of Plaintiff GENNADIY RYBAK. (MAC)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, RAYMOND MULLER, filed by GENNADIY RYBAK. (Filing fee $400, receipt number IP066588). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (MAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RYBAK v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENNADIY RYBAK
Represented By: Tae K. Sture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYMOND MULLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?