HENDON v. EVANS et al
Plaintiff: ANDREW HENDON and ANDREW W. HENDON
Defendant: ARTHUR L EVANS, WESLEY P EVANS, JEFFREY G HALTOM, WESLEY P. EVANS, ARTHUR L. EVANS and JEFFREY G. HALTOM
Case Number: 1:2019cv03887
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion Extending Time to Response to Plaintiff's Complaint to 11/11/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/5/2019. (JRB)
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Establish Unified Response Deadline, filed by Defendants ARTHUR L. EVANS, WESLEY P. EVANS, JEFFREY G. HALTOM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Overturf, Weston)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on November 26, 2019 at 11:00 a.m., Indianapolis Time (EST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/8/2019.(JRB)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Hamish S. Cohen on behalf of Defendants ARTHUR L. EVANS, WESLEY P. EVANS, JEFFREY G. HALTOM. (Cohen, Hamish)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants ARTHUR L. EVANS, WESLEY P. EVANS, JEFFREY G. HALTOM. (Overturf, Weston)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Weston E. Overturf on behalf of Defendants ARTHUR L. EVANS, WESLEY P. EVANS, JEFFREY G. HALTOM. (Overturf, Weston)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by ANDREW W. HENDON. JEFFREY G. HALTOM served on 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hagenow, Christopher)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by ANDREW W. HENDON. WESLEY P. EVANS served on 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hagenow, Christopher)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Stephen M. Montgomery for ANDREW W. HENDON added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/24/2019. (JRB)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Erik C. Lybeck for ANDREW W. HENDON added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/24/2019. (JRB)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen M. Montgomery to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5640040), filed by Plaintiff ANDREW W. HENDON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hagenow, Christopher)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Erik C. Lybeck to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5640022), filed by Plaintiff ANDREW W. HENDON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hagenow, Christopher)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Plaintiff ANDREW W. HENDON. (Hagenow, Christopher)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ARTHUR L. EVANS, WESLEY P. EVANS, and JEFFREY G. HALTOM. (DJH)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Hagenow on behalf of Plaintiff ANDREW HENDON. (Hagenow, Christopher)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5626212) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Hagenow, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HENDON v. EVANS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTHUR L EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESLEY P EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY G HALTOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESLEY P. EVANS
Represented By: Hamish S. Cohen
Represented By: Weston E. Overturf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTHUR L. EVANS
Represented By: Hamish S. Cohen
Represented By: Weston E. Overturf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY G. HALTOM
Represented By: Hamish S. Cohen
Represented By: Weston E. Overturf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW HENDON
Represented By: Christopher Charles Hagenow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW W. HENDON
Represented By: Christopher Charles Hagenow
Represented By: Erik C. Lybeck
Represented By: Stephen M. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?