COE v. J.P. MORGAN CHASE & COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MICHELLE Y. COE
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. and J.P. MORGAN CHASE & COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv03911
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1355
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend #3 MOTION for Default Judgment as to, filed by Plaintiff MICHELLE Y. COE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope) (CKM)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on the Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Courts Docket (Dkt. #4 ). S.D. Ind. Local Rule 7-1(a) states that all motions must be filed separately, but that alternative motions may be filed in a single document if each is named in the title. The Plaintiff's motion title does not encompass each alternative request for relief in her motion. Accordingly, the Court, being duly advised, hereby DENIES said Motion. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/4/2019. (SWM)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Correct the Courts Docket, filed by Plaintiff MICHELLE Y. COE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Sheet #2 Envelope) (CKM)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Default Judgment, filed by Plaintiff MICHELLE Y. COE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CKM)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J.P. MORGAN CHASE & COMPANY, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., filed by MICHELLE Y. COE. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope). (MAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COE v. J.P. MORGAN CHASE & COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE Y. COE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. MORGAN CHASE & COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?