PAYNE v. INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Plaintiff: DENNIS RAY PAYNE, JR.
Defendant: DOUG HUESTUS, INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT and KELLY RHODA
Case Number: 1:2019cv03957
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION requesting filed documents in this cause, filed by Plaintiff DENNIS RAY PAYNE, JR. (DWH)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COPIES: This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Request for Filed Documents in this Cause. [Dkt. #15 .] That motion is DENIED. In granting in part Plaintiff's previous motion for copies, the Court instructed the Clerk to provide Plaintiff with a copy of the docket so that Plaintiff could "review the docket and request specific orders if necessary." [Dkt. 11.] Plaintiff has not complied with these instructions; rather, he once again requests "copies for the documents filed in this cause," [Dkt. 15], without identifying which of the documents he does not have. Compliance with the Court's prior order is required. If Plaintiff wishes to receive electronic service of documents in this case, he must complete and return a Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program form for filing in this case. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of the Consent form along with this Order. Copies to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/13/2019. (SWM)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL: This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant to Provide Proof of Warrant to Seize Vehicle. [Dkt. #9 .] That motion is DENIED as premature. Defendants have not yet appeared in this matter; therefore, Plaintiff could not yet have properly served any discovery upon them. Once Defendants appear, Plaintiff may serve discovery requests in compliance with the applicable rules. A motion to compel would only be timely and proper if Defendants fail to properly respond to Plaintiff's requested discovery. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/13/2019. (SWM)
November 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing by DENNIS RAY PAYNE, JR. (MAC)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION Requesting Copies of Filed Documents in this cause, filed by Plaintiff DENNIS RAY PAYNE, JR. (MAC)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENTRY on In Forma Pauperis Status. In order to rule on the motion, Mr. Payne must submit a copy of the institution trust account for the 6month period preceding the filing of this action by December 9, 2019. Failure to take action in the time provided will result in dismissal of this action without further warning. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 11/8/2019. (MAC)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff DENNIS RAY PAYNE, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing by DENNIS RAY PAYNE, JR (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (DWH) Modified on 11/4/2019 (DWH). (Main Document 13 replaced on 11/4/2019) (DWH).
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 RECEIPT #IP067161 for partial filing fee in the amount of $16.00, paid by plaintiff. (AKH)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR COPIES - Mr. Payne's request for copies, dkt. #10 , is GRANTED to the extent that the clerk shall include a copy of the docket with his copy of this Order. The clerk will not at this time provide him with a copy of every file stamped document in this case. Instead, Mr. Payne may review the docket and request specific orders if necessary. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 10/28/2019. Copy of Order and Docket Sheet sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Copies of ALL "FILED" stamped documents, filed by Plaintiff DENNIS RAY PAYNE, JR. (DWH)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel, filed by Plaintiff DENNIS RAY PAYNE, JR. (DWH)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing, filed by Plaintiff DENNIS RAY PAYNE, JR (DWH)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - On September 24, 2019, 2019, the Court directed Mr. Payne to either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that he lacks the financial ability to do so by October 9, 2019. Dkt. 4. That deadline has passed and Mr. Payne has not paid the filing fee or filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Mr. Payne is ORDERED to either pay the $400 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by November 8, 2019. Failure to take either action in the time provided will result in dismissal of this action without further warning. Copy to Dennis Ray Payne, Jr. via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 10/11/2019.(JDH)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by DENNIS RAY PAYNE, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH) Modified on 10/2/2019 (MAC). (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/2/2019) (MAC).
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to court of filing complaint, filed by Plaintiff DENNIS RAY PAYNE, JR (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (DWH)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY Directing Further Proceedings - The plaintiff shall have through October 9, 2019, in which to either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that he lacks the financial ability to do so. If he seeks leave to proceed in forma pauperis, his request must be accompanied by a copy of the transactions associated with his institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action on September 19, 2019. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 9/24/2019. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Letter with information regarding e-file and e-service from Plaintiff. (AKH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2019: #1 Envelope) (AKH).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOUG HUESTUS, INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, KELLY RHODA, filed by DENNIS RAY PAYNE, JR. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAYNE v. INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS RAY PAYNE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUG HUESTUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY RHODA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?