YES LIGHTING LLC v. PSG ENERGY GROUP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: YES LIGHTING LLC
Defendant: PSG ENERGY GROUP, LLC, CITY OF CONNERSVILLE, TRM LIGHTING, LLC and LIGHT SOURCE OF INDIANA
Case Number: 1:2019cv03982
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 33 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
September 20, 2019 Filing 32 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-24365. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 19, 2019 ***Answer Deadline(s) terminated per #31 Order. (asl) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (mmc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 30 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #29 Order, by Yes Lighting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit composite exhibit a, #2 Exhibit exhibit b, #3 Exhibit exhibit c, #4 Exhibit exhibit d)(McCarthy, Martin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. Plaintiff must file a complete list of the members and their citizenship for YES Lighting LLC and PSG Energy Group LLC by no later than August 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order of Dismissal as to Defendant TRM Lighting Only. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
February 16, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Yes Lighting LLC (McCarthy, Martin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
February 16, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Yes Lighting LLC (McCarthy, Martin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order Dismissing Party City of Connersville, Indiana. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 24 Defendant's REPLY to #23 Response in Opposition to Motion in Opposition to Transfer Venue by PSG Energy Group, LLC. (Chen, Kir-Sheng) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 First MOTION to Change Venue filed by Yes Lighting LLC. Replies due by 2/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(McCarthy, Martin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response must be filed no later than February 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/28/2019. (ap00) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 21 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #15 First MOTION to Change Venue by Yes Lighting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCarthy, Martin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 20 Clerks Notice to Filer re #16 Summons Returned Executed: Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see 19 Summons Returned Executed. It is not necessary to refile this document. (pes) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #6 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline TRM Lighting, LLC served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/25/2018. See DE #16 for image. (pes) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #14 Order to Show Cause by Yes Lighting LLC. (McCarthy, Martin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of the City of Connorsville, Indiana by Yes Lighting LLC (McCarthy, Martin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #6 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Yes Lighting LLC. TRM Lighting, LLC served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (McCarthy, Martin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION to Change Venue by PSG Energy Group, LLC. Attorney Kir-Sheng Chen added to party PSG Energy Group, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/25/2019 (Chen, Kir-Sheng) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Must be filed no later than January 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/28/2018. (ap00) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 Amended Complaint by PSG Energy Group, LLC, TRM Lighting, LLC. Attorney John Anthony Chiocca added to party TRM Lighting, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Order)(Chiocca, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Anthony Chiocca on behalf of PSG Energy Group, LLC. Attorney John Anthony Chiocca added to party PSG Energy Group, LLC(pty:dft). (Chiocca, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to PSG Energy Group, LLC, TRM Lighting, LLC. (pes) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
November 24, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 7 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): TRM Lighting, LLC. (McCarthy, Martin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
November 24, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Yes Lighting LLC re #6 Amended Complaint filed by Yes Lighting LLC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Exhibit "A", #2 Summon(s) Exhibit "B") (McCarthy, Martin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Amended Complaint. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties. (pes) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Yes Lighting LLC.(McCarthy, Martin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Yes Lighting LLC re #1 Complaint (McCarthy, Martin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jao) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jao) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (jao) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11095363, filed by Yes Lighting LLC.(McCarthy, Martin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pes). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YES LIGHTING LLC v. PSG ENERGY GROUP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSG ENERGY GROUP, LLC
Represented By: John Anthony Chiocca
Represented By: Kir-Sheng Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF CONNERSVILLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRM LIGHTING, LLC
Represented By: John Anthony Chiocca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIGHT SOURCE OF INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YES LIGHTING LLC
Represented By: Martin G. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?