SPENCER v. WEISNER et al
Plaintiff: AMANDA DELEAN SPENCER
Defendant: MATT MEYERS, HOLLY CALHOUN, CINDY WEISNER, EVERSON and JOHN MARTOCCIA
Case Number: 1:2019cv04077
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff AMANDA DELEAN SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Thirty-Eight Dollars and Seven Cents ($38.07). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The plaintiff shall have through November 19, 2019, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. The plaintiff is informed that after the initial partial filing fee is paid, he will be obligated to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income each month that the amount in his account exceeds $10.00, until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid. 28 U.S. C. 1915(b)(2). After the initial partial filing fee is received, a collection order will be issued to the plaintiff and the plaintiff's custodian, and the Court will screen the complaint in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915A. (Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 10/21/2019. (JDC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #5 Notice of Deficiency, filed by Plaintiff AMANDA DELEAN SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Summary, #2 Envelope)(TMC)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through October 30, 2019, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff AMANDA DELEAN SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HOLLY CALHOUN, EVERSON, JOHN MARTOCCIA, MATT MEYERS, CINDY WEISNER, filed by AMANDA DELEAN SPENCER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPENCER v. WEISNER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATT MEYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLY CALHOUN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINDY WEISNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MARTOCCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA DELEAN SPENCER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?