SMITH v. WILKIE
Plaintiff: EARL D. SMITH
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE
Case Number: 1:2019cv04096
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ROBERT WILKIE, filed by EARL D. SMITH.(JDH)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SCREENING COMPLAINT, AND DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - The Court, having considered the above action and the matters that are pending, makes the following rulings: 1. Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis, #2 , is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiff's Complaint, #1 , is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 3. Plaintiff's Motion for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel, #3 , is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Mr. Smith may file an amended complaint that complies with Rule 8 on or before November 7, 2019. The failure to file an amended complaint that addresses the issues outlined in this Order by that date will result in dismissal of this action. Should the amended complaint properly invoke this Court's jurisdiction, it will then be subject to screening for legal sufficiency. (See Entry). Copy to Earl D. Smith via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/8/2019. (JDH) Modified on 10/8/2019 (JDH).
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for assistance with recruiting counsel, filed by Plaintiff EARL D. SMITH. (AKH)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff EARL D. SMITH. (AKH)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT WILKIE, filed by EARL D. SMITH. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Facts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Office of Federal Operations Letters). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. WILKIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EARL D. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?