SNYDER v. MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Plaintiff: Timothy S. Snyder
Defendant: Marion County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 1:2019cv04099
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE.(Scheil, Andrew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE. (Scheil, Andrew)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on December 13, 2019 at 11:30 a.m., Indianapolis Time (EST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/8/2019.(JRB)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Plaintiff TIMOTHY S. SNYDER. (McQuary, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. McQuary on behalf of Plaintiff TIMOTHY S. SNYDER. (McQuary, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Upchurch on behalf of Defendant Marion County Sheriff's Office. (Upchurch, Andrew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Supplemental Notice of Removal, filed by Defendant Marion County Sheriff's Office, re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Notice of Removal) (Scheil, Andrew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Scheil on behalf of Defendant Marion County Sheriff's Office. (Scheil, Andrew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, case number 49D03-1907-CT-029219, filed by Marion County Sheriff's Office. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5660483) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record CCS, Complaint, Appearance,Appearance, Summons, Appearance, Notice of Automatic Extension of Time, #2 State Court Record Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scheil, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNYDER v. MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy S. Snyder
Represented By: Michael Edward Morken
Represented By: Jeffrey S. McQuary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Andrew J. Upchurch
Represented By: Andrew Scheil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?