MWANGANGI v. NIELSEN et al
Plaintiff: DAUDI M MWANGANGI
Defendant: BEN PHELPS, FRANK NOLAND, TREY HENDRIX, CITY OF LEBANON, INDIANA, TAYLOR NIELSEN, WESTLEY GARST and BLAINE ROOT
Case Number: 1:2019cv04105
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #2 Complaint , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY, filed by BLAINE ROOT.(Layden, Daniel)
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #2 Complaint , filed by CITY OF LEBANON, INDIANA, TREY HENDRIX, TAYLOR NIELSEN, FRANK NOLAND, BEN PHELPS.(Baron, Lisa)
November 22, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #2 Complaint , filed by WESTLEY GARST.(Belch, Paul)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Paul on behalf of Defendant BLAINE ROOT. (Paul, Daniel)
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant BLAINE ROOT. (Layden, Daniel)
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Joseph Layden on behalf of Defendant BLAINE ROOT. (Layden, Daniel)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 12:30 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) on or before December 4, 2019 in the format set forth in the model CMP found on the Court's website (www.insd.uscourts.gov). Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines as set forth. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/30/2019. (GD)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Defendant Westley Garst's #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 11/25/2019. No further enlargement of this deadline is anticipated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/30/2019. (SWM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of Service, filed by DAUDI M. MWANGANGI. CITY OF LEBANON, INDIANA served on 10/10/2019; TREY HENDRIX served on 10/10/2019; FRANK NOLAND served on 10/10/2019; BEN PHELPS served on 10/10/2019; BLAINE ROOT served on 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A RETURN RECEIPT, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B RETURN RECEIPT, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C RETURN RECEIPT, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D RETURN RECEIPT, #5 Exhibit EXHBIT D RETURN RECEIPT)(Bielski, Edward)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to November 25, 2019 in which to #2 Complaint File Answer, filed by Defendant WESTLEY GARST. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Westley Garst's Motion for Initial Extension of Time to File Answer)(Belch, Paul)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Thomas Belch on behalf of Defendant WESTLEY GARST. (Belch, Paul)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Knight on behalf of Defendants CITY OF LEBANON, INDIANA, TREY HENDRIX, TAYLOR NIELSEN, FRANK NOLAND, BEN PHELPS. (Knight, Elizabeth)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF EXTENSION, filed by Defendants CITY OF LEBANON, INDIANA, TREY HENDRIX, TAYLOR NIELSEN, FRANK NOLAND, BEN PHELPS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Baron, Lisa)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A. Baron on behalf of Defendants CITY OF LEBANON, INDIANA, TREY HENDRIX, TAYLOR NIELSEN, FRANK NOLAND, BEN PHELPS. (Baron, Lisa)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to TAYLOR NIELSEN. (JDH)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to TAYLOR NIELSEN. (Bielski, Edward)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CITY OF LEBANON, INDIANA, WESTLEY GARST, TREY HENDRIX, TAYLOR NIELSEN, FRANK NOLAND, BEN PHELPS, BLAINE ROOT. (REO)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 0756-5661964 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Bielski, Edward) Modified on 10/4/2019 (REO). Modified on 10/4/2019 (REO).
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Bielski on behalf of Plaintiff DAUDI M MWANGANGI. (Bielski, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MWANGANGI v. NIELSEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEN PHELPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK NOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TREY HENDRIX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF LEBANON, INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAYLOR NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTLEY GARST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLAINE ROOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAUDI M MWANGANGI
Represented By: Edward G. Bielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?