SHIRLEY v. IMPD SWAT
Plaintiff: HENRY SHIRLEY
Defendant: IMPD SWAT
Case Number: 1:2019cv04111
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant IMPD SWAT. (Cosby, Traci)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by IMPD SWAT. IMPD SWAT waiver sent on 11/4/2019. (Cosby, Traci)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Traci Marie Cosby on behalf of Defendant IMPD SWAT. (Cosby, Traci)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by HENRY SHIRLEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk to: Indianapolis Metropolitan Police Department, SWAT. (NAD)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTRY - GRANTING #2 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, DISCUSSING ACTION, AND DIRECTING SERVICE. The filing fee for in forma pauperis litigants is $350.00. No payment is due currently; however, the $350.00 balance remains owing. Because Plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis, Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(c)(3) requires the Court to order service for Plaintiff. Accordingly, the Clerk is designated pursuant to Rule 4(c)(3) to issue process to Defendant IMPD Swat in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the Complaint (Filing No. #1 ), applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/7/2019.(NAD)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. Mailed copy to Plaintiff via US Mail (NAD)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00762. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court TRANSFERS this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Judge Jon E. DeGuilio on 10/3/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (rmf) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/7/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Henry Shirley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rmc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/7/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Henry Shirley. (nae) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/7/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms and with Jury Demand against IMPD Swat, filed by Henry Shirley. (Returned file stamped copy with case number to Shirley)(nae) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHIRLEY v. IMPD SWAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMPD SWAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY SHIRLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?