SALAZAR v. BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR
Defendant: BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04113
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
2 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-4113-TWP-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/15/2019. (ADH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Padgett, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Padgett, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Padgett on behalf of Defendant BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Padgett, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Carl Mohler on behalf of Defendant BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Mohler, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed by NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR. BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC served on 10/28/2019. (Sink, Ryan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig M. Williams on behalf of Plaintiff NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR. (Williams, Craig)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (NAD)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Sink, Ryan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Proposed Summons against BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, filed by NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Sink, Ryan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Patrick Sink on behalf of Plaintiff NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR. (Sink, Ryan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, filed by NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR. (Filing fee $400, receipt number IP066858) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights; EEOC Form 5; Mediation Agreement; Confidentiality Agreement)(AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALAZAR v. BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR
Represented By: Craig M. Williams
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Sink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Padgett
Represented By: Michael Carl Mohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?