GRAHAM v. HEALTHPLEX et al
Plaintiff: BRYANT L. GRAHAM
Defendant: ADNON HYDER and HEALTHPLEX
Case Number: 1:2019cv04120
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION For Counsel, filed by Plaintiff BRYANT L. GRAHAM. (JDC)
November 26, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Bench Trial, filed by Defendants HEALTHPLEX, ADNON HYDER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Borek, Rosemary)
November 26, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendants HEALTHPLEX, ADNON HYDER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Borek, Rosemary)
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to , filed by Defendants HEALTHPLEX, ADNON HYDER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Borek, Rosemary)
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION For Bench Trial, filed by Plaintiff BRYANT L. GRAHAM. (JDC)
November 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to, filed by Plaintiff BRYANT L. GRAHAM. (JDC)
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff BRYANT L. GRAHAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit pictures, #2 Exhibit documents)(JDC)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosemary L. Borek on behalf of Defendants HEALTHPLEX, ADNON HYDER. (Borek, Rosemary)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by ADNON HYDER, HEALTHPLEX. ADNON HYDER waiver sent on 10/17/2019. (Stephenson, James)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by ADNON HYDER, HEALTHPLEX. HEALTHPLEX waiver sent on 10/17/2019. (Stephenson, James)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendants HEALTHPLEX, ADNON HYDER. (Stephenson, James)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Stephenson on behalf of Defendants HEALTHPLEX, ADNON HYDER. (Stephenson, James)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denied without prejudice as premature #7 Motion for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel. (Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail) ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION*** Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 11/15/2019. (JDC)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRYANT L. GRAHAM waiver sent on 10/17/2019. (JDC)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION For Assistance with Recruiting Counsel, filed by Plaintiff BRYANT L. GRAHAM. (JDC)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk to Healthplex and Adnon Hyder (LAB) (JDC)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Because the plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis, Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(c)(3) requires the Court to order service for the plaintiff. Accordingly, the clerk is designated pursuant to Rule 4(c)(3) to issue process to defendants Healthplex and Adnon Hyer in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the complaint (docket 1), applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. (Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 10/17/2019. (JDC)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by BRYANT L. GRAHAM. (JDC)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff BRYANT L. GRAHAM. (AKH)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HEALTHPLEX, ADNON HYDER, filed by BRYANT L. GRAHAM. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Right to Suit, #2 Exhibit 2 - EEOC Complaint Documentation and Correspondence). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAHAM v. HEALTHPLEX et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADNON HYDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTHPLEX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYANT L. GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?