CRUZ-RIVERA v. WILLIAMS et al
Plaintiff: ROBERTO CRUZ-RIVERA
Defendant: SGT. JOHNSON, T WILLIAMS, JARED NEUTZMAN, ROBIN WHITLEY, UNDERWOOD and DETECTIVE KNOX
Case Number: 1:2019cv04238
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 Mail Returned as undeliverable, return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. (730 E. Washington St, Indpls, IN 46202) #12 Closed Judgment, #11 Order sent to ROBERTO CRUZ-RIVERA. (JDC)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 CLOSED JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - The Court now enters final judgment. The action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Copy to Roberto Cruz-Rivera via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 11/26/2019.(JDH)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE AND DIRECTING ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT - On October 21, 2019, a Court Order sent to the plaintiff at his last reported address returned to the Court marked "return to sender--released 10-22-19." Dkt. 8. Since that time, every Court Order sent to the plaintiff has returned as undeliverable. The plaintiff has not updated his address or filed anything with the Court since filing the complaint on October 9, 2019. On October 31, 2019, the Court ordered the plaintiff to report his current address and either pay the filing fee or provide the Court with a trust account statement by November 22, 2019. Dkt. 9. The Order informed the plaintiff that failure to comply would result in the dismissal of this action without further notice for failure to prosecute. The plaintiff's copy of the Order returned to the Court undelivered on November 14, 2019. Dkt. 10. Because the plaintiff has abandoned this action, it is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Final judgment in accordance with this Order shall now issue. Copy to Roberto Cruz-Rivera via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 11/26/2019.(JDH)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as undeliverable, return to sender, not deliverable as addressed and unable to forward. (Released, 730 E. Washington St, Indpls, IN 46202) #9 Order sent to ROBERTO CRUZ-RIVERA. (JDC)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO REPORT CURRENT ADDRESS AND PAY FILING FEE OR RENEW MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - A Court order sent to the plaintiff on October 17, 2019, at his last reported address has returned to the Court marked "return to sender--released 10-22-19." Since then, the plaintiff has not updated his address with the Court or filed anything in this action. To proceed with this litigation, the Court must be able to communicate with the plaintiff through the United States Postal System. The plaintiff shall have through November 22, 2019, in which to report his current address in writing. If he does not report a current address by that time, the Court will presume that he has abandoned this action, which will result in the dismissal of the action without further notice for failure to prosecute. In addition, the plaintiff failed to include an inmate trust account with his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. He shall have through November 22, 2019, in which to either pay the $400 filing fee or renew his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by completing and returning a form motion. The clerk is directed to include a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis form with the plaintiff's copy of this Order. Failure to comply with either of these deadlines will result in the dismissal of the action without further notice for failure to prosecute and failure to pay the filing fee. (Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail). Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 form of proceed in forma pauperis)(JDC)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #6 Notice of Deficiency sent to ROBERTO CRUZ-RIVERA 791294 730 East Washington St. Indianapolis, IN 46202. Return to sender - released 10-22-2019. (TMC)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as undeliverable, return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward (730 East Washington St, Indpls, IN 46202) Released on 10-22-2019 #5 Magistrate Judge's Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction sent to ROBERTO CRUZ-RIVERA. (JDC)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through November 15, 2019, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JDC)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00898. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring case to the Southern District of Indiana, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/15/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ksp) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2019.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Roberto Cruz-Rivera. (nae) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2019.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Johnson, Knox, Jared Neutzman, Underwood, Robin Whitley, T Williams, filed by Roberto Cruz-Rivera. (Returned file stamped copy with case number to Cruz-Rivera) (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope)(nae) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRUZ-RIVERA v. WILLIAMS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JARED NEUTZMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN WHITLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNDERWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE KNOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERTO CRUZ-RIVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?