INDIANA VOTE BY MAIL et al v. INDIANA ELECTION COMMISSION et al
Plaintiff: PATRICIA CARLIN, LEAH KENAGA, PATRICIA BROWN, VIRGINIA WOESTE, RENEE CASON and INDIANA VOTE BY MAIL
Defendant: CONNIE LAWSON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT, PAUL OKESON, S ANTHONY LONG, ZACHARY E KLUTZ, INDIANA ELECTION COMMISSION, S. ANTHONY LONG and ZACHARY E. KLUTZ
Case Number: 1:2019cv04245
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 4:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference in the format set forth in the model CMP found on the Court's website (www.insd.uscourts.gov). Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines as set forth. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/12/2019. (GD)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and STATEMENT OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, filed by CONNIE LAWSON.(McClain, Rebecca)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Parvinder Kaur Nijjar on behalf of Defendants INDIANA ELECTION COMMISSION, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (Nijjar, Parvinder)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jefferson S. Garn on behalf of Defendants INDIANA ELECTION COMMISSION, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (Garn, Jefferson)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants INDIANA ELECTION COMMISSION, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (McClain, Rebecca)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. McClain on behalf of Defendants INDIANA ELECTION COMMISSION, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (McClain, Rebecca)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to INDIANA ELECTION COMMISSION, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (AKH)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Groth on behalf of Plaintiffs PATRICIA BROWN, PATRICIA CARLIN, RENEE CASON, INDIANA VOTE BY MAIL, LEAH KENAGA, VIRGINIA WOESTE. (Groth, William)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5680551) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Groth, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INDIANA VOTE BY MAIL et al v. INDIANA ELECTION COMMISSION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA CARLIN
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAH KENAGA
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA BROWN
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA WOESTE
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENEE CASON
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA VOTE BY MAIL
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE LAWSON
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Represented By: Rebecca L. McClain
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Represented By: Rebecca L. McClain
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL OKESON
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Represented By: Rebecca L. McClain
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S ANTHONY LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZACHARY E KLUTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA ELECTION COMMISSION
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Represented By: Rebecca L. McClain
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. ANTHONY LONG
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Represented By: Rebecca L. McClain
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZACHARY E. KLUTZ
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Represented By: Rebecca L. McClain
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?