SAMSON FAMILY LEATHER, LLC v. MEYERS et al
Plaintiff: SAMSON FAMILY LEATHER, LLC
Defendant: DONLYN MEYERS, KELSEY LOWDEN and SMOKE & FIRE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv04433
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants KELSEY LOWDEN, DONLYN MEYERS, SMOKE & FIRE COMPANY . (Cody, Christopher)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2020 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/4/2019.(SWM)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants KELSEY LOWDEN, DONLYN MEYERS, SMOKE & FIRE COMPANY. (Cody, Christopher)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Douglas Cody on behalf of Defendants KELSEY LOWDEN, DONLYN MEYERS, SMOKE & FIRE COMPANY. (Cody, Christopher)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by SAMSON FAMILY LEATHER, LLC. KELSEY LOWDEN served on 11/13/2019; DONLYN MEYERS served on 11/13/2019; SMOKE & FIRE COMPANY served on 11/13/2019. (Piatt, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAMSON FAMILY LEATHER, LLC. (Piatt, James)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to KELSEY LOWDEN, DONLYN MEYERS, SMOKE & FIRE COMPANY. (AKH)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph N. Williams on behalf of Plaintiff SAMSON FAMILY LEATHER, LLC. (Williams, Joseph)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James Piatt on behalf of Plaintiff SAMSON FAMILY LEATHER, LLC. (Piatt, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against All Defendants, filed by SAMSON FAMILY LEATHER, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5705521) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Piatt, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAMSON FAMILY LEATHER, LLC v. MEYERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMSON FAMILY LEATHER, LLC
Represented By: Joseph N. Williams
Represented By: James Piatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONLYN MEYERS
Represented By: Christopher Douglas Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELSEY LOWDEN
Represented By: Christopher Douglas Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMOKE & FIRE COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher Douglas Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?