FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC et al v. TBB AMERICA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC, NTP HURSTBOURNE, LLC and FELECIA KOERBER
Defendant: TONY PALOMBINO and TBB AMERICA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04457
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Acknowledges Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/20/2019. (marginal notation)(CKM)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiffs FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC, FELECIA KOERBER, NTP HURSTBOURNE, LLC. (Brown, Josh)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file an Amended Complaint within fourteen days of the date of this entry, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order by properly alleging a basis for diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/14/2019.(CBU)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 Submission of Signature Requirement re #3 Notice of Appearance by All Plaintiffs. (Maris, Stephanie)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to TONY PALOMBINO, TBB AMERICA, LLC. (AKH)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NTP HURSTBOURNE, LLC. (Brown, Josh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Brown, Josh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Josh F. Brown on behalf of Plaintiffs FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC, FELECIA KOERBER, NTP HURSTBOURNE, LLC. (Brown, Josh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Josh F. Brown on behalf of Plaintiffs FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC, FELECIA KOERBER, NTP HURSTBOURNE, LLC. (Brown, Josh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5710687) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Brown, Josh) Modified on 11/6/2019 (AKH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC et al v. TBB AMERICA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FTK INVESTMENTS, LLC
Represented By: Josh F. Brown
Represented By: Stephanie Maris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NTP HURSTBOURNE, LLC
Represented By: Josh F. Brown
Represented By: Stephanie Maris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FELECIA KOERBER
Represented By: Josh F. Brown
Represented By: Stephanie Maris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONY PALOMBINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBB AMERICA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?