HAYES v. ZATECKY
Petitioner: QUINTERO HAYES
Respondent: D. ZATECKY
Case Number: 1:2019cv04459
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 Respondent's Notice of 42-day Extension of Deadline to File a Return to Order Show Cause, filed by D. ZATECKY. Return to Order to Show Cause deadline is 1/31/2020. (Recker, Abigail)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order on In Forma Pauperis Status - The petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #9 , is granted. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/12/2019. (JDH)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Petitioner QUINTERO HAYES. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Trust Statement)(JDH)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by QUINTERO HAYES. (JDH)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Recker on behalf of Respondent D. ZATECKY. (Recker, Abigail)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on In Forma Pauperis Status - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #4 , is granted. Although the plaintiff is excused from pre-paying the full filing fee, he still must pay the three hundred and fifty dollar ($350.00) filing fee pursuant to the statutory formula set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2) when able. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) ("the prisoner shall be required to pay the full amount of a filing fee."). The assessment of even an initial partial filing fee is waived because the plaintiff has no assets and no means by which to pay a partial filing fee. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(4). Accordingly, no initial partial filing fee is due at this time. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/2/2019. (JDH)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by QUINTERO HAYES located at PENDLETON CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by QUINTERO HAYES to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JDC)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Petitioner QUINTERO HAYES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Trust Statement)(JDH)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Disciplinary) The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 12/20/2019. (See Order). Copy to Quintero Hayes via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/8/2019.(JDH)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by QUINTERO HAYES. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Disciplinary Hearing, #2 Exhibit B - Report of Conduct, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to Lay Advocate/Witness, #4 Exhibit D - Notice to Lay Advocate/Witness, #5 Exhibit E - Notice to Lay Advocate/Witness, #6 Exhibit F - Report of Disciplinary Hearing, #7 Exhibit G - Request for Interview, #8 Exhibit H - Report of Disciplinary Hearing Video Evidence Review, #9 Exhibit I - Request for Interview, #10 Exhibit J - Report of Disciplinary Hearing Video Evidence Review, #11 Exhibit K - Disciplinary Process for Adult Offenders)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAYES v. ZATECKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. ZATECKY
Represented By: Abigail Recker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: QUINTERO HAYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?