LEFLORE v. STATE OF INDIANA
Petitioner: BAKARI LEFLORE
Respondent: STATE OF INDIANA
Case Number: 1:2019cv04536
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Respondent STATE OF INDIANA. (Kobe, Andrew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 RECEIPT #IP067358 for habeas filing fee in the amount of $5.00, paid by petitioner. (AKH)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A. Kobe on behalf of Respondent STATE OF INDIANA. (Kobe, Andrew)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (State Conviction) - BAKARI LEFLORE's petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenges the petitioner's conviction and sentence in Indiana state court case number 49G06-0304-MR-054375. Petitioner shall have through 12/13/2019, in which to either pay the $5.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate his/her financial inability to do so. Respondent is ORDERED to enter an appearance by 11/26/2019. If respondent argues that all claims in the petition are subject to one of the procedural bars for dismissal outlined in Rule 5(b), respondent is ORDERED to file a motion to dismiss based on a complete procedural bar by 12/26/2019. If Track 1 does not apply, respondent is ORDERED to answer the petition by 1/16/2020. The Court does not anticipate extending respondent's deadlines absent respondent specifically setting forth extraordinary circumstances (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION AND DEADLINES) (Copy to Petitioner via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 11/14/2019. (JDC)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by BAKARI LEFLORE. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEFLORE v. STATE OF INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: Andrew A. Kobe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BAKARI LEFLORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?