GARLAND v. KOWALSKI
Plaintiff: April Garland
Defendant: Paul J. Kowalski
Case Number: 1:2019cv04583
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant files ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, filed by PAUL J. KOWALSKI.(Matheny, Marc)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff APRIL GARLAND . (Theisen, John)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2020 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/9/2019.(SWM)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant PAUL J. KOWALSKI. (Matheny, Marc)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Landwerlen on behalf of Defendant PAUL J. KOWALSKI. (Landwerlen, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc William Matheny on behalf of Defendant PAUL J. KOWALSKI. (Matheny, Marc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Appearances served on Defendant, Paul J. Kowalski on 11/25/2019, filed by APRIL GARLAND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - USPS Tracking, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Green Card)(Theisen, John)
November 17, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
November 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to PAUL J. KOWALSKI. (JRB)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel O. Hubley on behalf of Plaintiff April Garland. (Hubley, Nathaniel)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Theisen on behalf of Plaintiff April Garland. (Theisen, John)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against Paul J. Kowalski, filed by April Garland. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5725755) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Theisen, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARLAND v. KOWALSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Garland
Represented By: Nathaniel O. Hubley
Represented By: John C. Theisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Kowalski
Represented By: Marc William Matheny
Represented By: Thomas L. Landwerlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?