MEYER v. METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF MARTINSVILLE
Plaintiff: TRACY MEYER
Defendant: METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF MARTINSVILLE
Case Number: 1:2019cv04842
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF MARTINSVILLE. (Pollack, Caren)
February 6, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF MARTINSVILLE.(Pollack, Caren)
February 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pre-Trial Conference of March 5, 2020, filed by Defendant METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF MARTINSVILLE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Continue Initial Pre-Trial Conference)(Pollack, Caren)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2020 03:00 PM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 2/3/2020.(SWM)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - On December 30, 2019, the Court provided notice to pro se Plaintiff regarding confidential information contained in documents and granting leave to file redactions. Redacted versions of the previously filed documents have not been filed. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall remove the security restrictions on Dkt. 1-1. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/28/2020.(NAD)
January 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dutkanych, III on behalf of Plaintiff TRACY MEYER. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Jon Ferguson on behalf of Plaintiff TRACY MEYER. (Ferguson, Taylor)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF - It has come to the Court's attention that exhibit 1 attached to pro se Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. 1-1) contains Plaintiff's date of birth. The Clerk of Court is directed to temporarily restrict the exhibit to case participants only. Local Rule 5-11(c)(2) provides: "When any of the confidential information in a document is irrelevant or immaterial to resolution of the matter at issue, the filing party may redact, by blacking out, the confidential information in lieu of filing under seal." If appropriate, Plaintiff is given leave to redact the confidential information and re-file the exhibit within twenty-one days of this notice. If a redacted version is not filed within twenty-one days, the case participants restriction will be removed. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/30/2019.(NAD)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF MARTINSVILLE. METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF MARTINSVILLE waiver sent on 12/17/2019. (Pollack, Caren)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Caren L. Pollack on behalf of Defendant METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF MARTINSVILLE. (Pollack, Caren)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk to: Metropolitan School District of Martinsville. (NAD)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTRY - GRANTING #2 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, DISCUSSING ACTION, AND DIRECTING SERVICE. No payment is due currently; however, the $350.00 balance remains owing. At this time, the Court has not determined that the action must be dismissed pursuant to 1915(e) and therefore shall proceed. This ruling is without prejudice to the filing of a proper Rule 12 motion. Because Plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis, Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(c)(3) requires the Court to order service for Plaintiff. Accordingly, the Clerk is designated pursuant to Rule 4(c)(3) to issue process to Defendant Metropolitan School District of Martinsville in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the Complaint ( Filing No. #1 ), applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. (See Entry.) Copies per distribution list via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/16/2019. (NAD)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff TRACY MEYER. (AKH)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF MARTINSVILLE, filed by TRACY MEYER. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Documents). (AKH) Modified on 12/31/2019 - Edited document restriction per Entry at #8 (NAD). Modified on 1/29/2020 - Removed restriction as to dkt 1-1 per Order at #11 (NAD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEYER v. METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF MARTINSVILLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF MARTINSVILLE
Represented By: Caren L. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY MEYER
Represented By: Andrew Dutkanych, III
Represented By: Taylor Jon Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?