SMITH v. PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL, LLC
Appellant: MARSHRELY REED SMITH
Appellee: PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04889
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 CLOSED DISMISSED - On February 3, 2020, we were informed by the bankruptcy court that Ms. Smith had not filed her designation of the record and statement of issues, nor provided any reason for this failure. Dkt. 6; In re Smith. 19- BR-02423-RLM, Dkt. 140. Accordingly, consistent with our previous admonition to Ms. Smith, the Appeal from Bankruptcy Court is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 2/5/2020. Copy Mailed. (CKM)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 Notice to District Court: Appellant failed to file Designation of Record with Bankruptcy Court. (NAR)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - On November 22, 2019, Appellant Marshrely Reed Smith filed a Notice of Appeal to the District Court challenging an order entered against her in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Indiana. The Bankruptcy Court has specifically advised Ms. Smith of her obligation to file the designation of record and statement of issues. The Bankruptcy Court forewarned Ms. Smith that she had exhausted her extensions of time for this purpose and would not be permitted any further extensions of time, absent emergency circumstance. To these notifications we add the following admonition; which constitutes the direct and explicit warning required prior to dismissal her appeal will be dismissed with prejudice (meaning that there will not be a future opportunity to seek an appeal of the disputed bankruptcy order) if appellant fails to file and serve her designation of the record and statement of issues with the bankruptcy court by January 31, 2020, or provides good cause for her failure to do so. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 1/17/2020. Copy Mailed. (CKM)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 Notice to District Court: Appellant failed to file Designation of Record with Bankruptcy Court (BRB)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice to District Court: Order Granting Motion for Stay Pending Appeal as Modified and Order Directing Debtor To Post Bond. Debtor must post a bond of $5760 (equal to 4 months rent of $1440/ month) within 21 days of this order signed by Judge Robin L. Moberly on 11/27/2019. (NAR)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Parties of Briefing Schedule in accordance with Rule 8018 of the Bankruptcy Rules of Procedure. Copy sent to Appellant via US Mail (JRB)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-2423. File received, filed by MARSHRELY REED SMITH. Copy to Appellant via US Mail.(NAR) Modified on 12/12/2019 (JRB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MARSHRELY REED SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL, LLC
Represented By: John R. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?