YOUNG v. KNIGHT et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT E. YOUNG
Defendant: JANE DOE, D. TOMAW, STANLEY KNIGHT and K. HAMPTON
Case Number: 1:2019cv05059
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 14 Documents for Service by IDOC - re #12 OrderAdd and Terminate Parties, #13 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk, #1 Complaint. (AAS)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk - Lt. D. Tomaw (AAS)
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 Entry Screening Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings - The clerk is directed to terminate Stanley Knight and K. Hampton as defendants on thedocket. The clerk is directed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) to issue process to defendant Lt. D. Tomaw in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the complaint filed on December 30, 2019, docket #1 , applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. The clerk is directed to serve the Indiana Department of Correction employee electronically. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/19/2020.(AAS) Modified on 2/20/2020 (AAS).
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Plaintiff's Wife. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CKM)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff ROBERT E. YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff ROBERT E. YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff ROBERT E. YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Letter dated 9/20/19 from IDOC re Kenneth Falk's inquiry, #2 Exhibit B- Letter dated 8/29/19 from Kenneth Falk to Bob Bugher, #3 Exhibit C- Letters re representation, #4 Exhibit D- Letter from Plaintiff to Judge Pratt, #5 Cover Letter, #6 Envelope)(NAD)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 RECEIPT #IP068062 for filing fee in the amount of $350.00, paid by Plaintiff. (REO)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by ROBERT E. YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CKM)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Sixty-Six Dollars and Eighty-Two Cents ($66.82). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The plaintiff shall have through January 29, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. After the initial partial filing fee is received, a collection order will be issued to theplaintiff and the plaintiffs custodian, and the Court will screen the complaint in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915A. See order for details. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/2/2020 (Copy mailed to Plaintiff). (LBT)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy to plaintiff by US Mail. (MEH)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ROBERT E. YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Offender Trust System Inquiry, #2 Envelope).(AKH)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JANE DOE, K. HAMPTON, STANLEY KNIGHT, D. TOMAW, filed by ROBERT E. YOUNG. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 USM 285 Form, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit A - Notice of Tort, #5 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNG v. KNIGHT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. TOMAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANLEY KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. HAMPTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT E. YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?