SLUSSER v. FCA US, LLC
Plaintiff: MARLENE SLUSSER
Defendant: FCA US LLC and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00011
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
2 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 29:626
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Padgett, Michael)
February 7, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US, LLC. (Padgett, Michael)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Padgett on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Padgett, Michael)
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary A. Ahonen on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Ahonen, Zachary)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to FCA US, LLC. (NLR) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/6/2020) (NLR). (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/6/2020) (NLR).
January 6, 2020 ***PLEASE DISREGARD*** (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) CLERK'S NOTICE - The plaintiff has tendered a summons that is not in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(a)(1)(B), which requires a summons be directed to the defendant. Plaintiff has tendered a summons that does not contain Defendant's name and address. The Clerk cannot issue a summons that is not properly completed. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(b). Plaintiff is directed to resubmit a properly completed summons for issuance. (BRR) Modified on 1/6/2020 (BRR).
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-cv-00011-JRS-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (AKH)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - In the interest of speedy administration of justice, to ensure appropriate oversight, and pursuant to Local Rule 40-1(f), the Clerk IS HEREBY ORDERED to reassign this matter to Magistrate Judge Baker. The parties should use the above cause number in all future filings in this matter. All case schedules and deadlines before the District Judge and Magistrate Judge remain unchanged at this time, including hearing, conference, and trial dates. In the event that any calendared dates must be vacated and reassigned, the parties will receive notice by separate order. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/3/2020.(JDH)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 Submission of Corrected Summons, filed by Plaintiff MARLENE SLUSSER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons (Corrected))(Meisenhelder, Jay)
January 3, 2020 (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) CLERK'S NOTICE - The plaintiff has tendered a summons that is not in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(a)(1)(B), which requires a summons be directed to the defendant. Plaintiff has tendered a summons directed to FCA US, LLC - without an address for FCA US, LLC. The Clerk cannot issue a summons that is not properly completed. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(b). Plaintiff is directed to resubmit a properly completed summons for issuance. (BRR)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Meisenhelder on behalf of Plaintiff MARLENE SLUSSER. (Meisenhelder, Jay)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against FCA US LLC, filed by MARLENE SLUSSER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5792031) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Meisenhelder, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SLUSSER v. FCA US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Padgett
Represented By: Zachary A. Ahonen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLENE SLUSSER
Represented By: Jay Meisenhelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?