QUINNELL v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Stephen J. Quinnell and STEPHEN J. QUINNELL
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK MEDICAL INC, WILLIAMS COOK EUROPE, COOK INCORPORATED and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2020cv00055
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
2 Judge: James R Sweeney
3 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:20-cv-00055-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00056-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00058-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00067-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00068-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00072-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00073-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 1/15/2020. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00055-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00056-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00058-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00067-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00068-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00072-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-00073-RLY-TAB (LBT)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/15/2020.(LBT)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. (Pierson, Andrea)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Ellen Mancuso on behalf of Plaintiff STEPHEN J. QUINNELL. (Mancuso, Christina)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. (McDonald, Kip)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge James R. Sweeney II, Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-cv-00055-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (AKH)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT STEPHEN J. QUINNELL against COOK MEDICAL INC, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAMS COOK EUROPE APS, filed by Stephen J. Quinnell. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5799333) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mancuso, Christina) Modified on 1/9/2020 (AKH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QUINNELL v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Stephen J. Quinnell
Represented By: Christina Ellen Mancuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN J. QUINNELL
Represented By: Christina Ellen Mancuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAMS COOK EUROPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?