VERBOVSZKY et al v. DOREL JUVENILE GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff: HUG ME JOEY, LLC and ESTHER A. L. VERBOVSZKY
Defendant: DOREL JUVENILE GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00061
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. DOREL JUVENILE GROUP, INC. served on 2/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed Return Receipt Card)(Weber, Ray)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Ray L. Weber to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff's. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/10/2020. (JRB)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Laura J. Gentilcore on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/10/2020. (JRB)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 Amended Motion for Laura J. Gentilcore to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission, filed by Plaintiffs HUG ME JOEY, LLC, ESTHER A. L. VERBOVSZKY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Weber, Ray) Modified on 1/10/2020 (JRB). Modified on 1/10/2020 (JRB).
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 Amended Motion for Ray L. Weber to Appeara Pro Hac Vice Admission, filed by Plaintiffs HUG ME JOEY, LLC, ESTHER A. L. VERBOVSZKY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Weber, Ray) Modified on 1/10/2020 (JRB). Modified on 1/10/2020 (JRB).
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to DOREL JUVENILE GROUP, INC. (REO)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOREL JUVENILE GROUP, INC., filed by ESTHER A. L. VERBOVSZKY, HUG ME JOEY, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number IP067932) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - United State Patent 6,467,840, #2 Exhibit 2 - Image of box with Hug Me Joey Label containing patent information, #3 Exhibit 3 - image of Maxi-Cosi Mico Max 30 box, #4 Exhibit 4 - Patent Claim Chart for US Patent No. 6,467,840 Claim 1, #5 Exhibit 5 - Patent Claim Chart for US Patent No. 6,467,840 Claim 23, #6 Exhibit 6 - image of Maxi-Cosi Pria 85 Max box, #7 Exhibit 7 - Safety 1st UltraMax Air 360 installation instructions, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Envelope)(REO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2020: #11 Cover Letter) (REO).
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ray L. Weber to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number IP067916), filed by Plaintiff ESTHER A. L. VERBOVSZKY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(REO)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Attorney(s) Laura J. Gentilcore to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number IP067917), filed by Plaintiff ESTHER A. L. VERBOVSZKY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(REO) Modified on 1/9/2020 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VERBOVSZKY et al v. DOREL JUVENILE GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOREL JUVENILE GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUG ME JOEY, LLC
Represented By: Laura J. Gentilcore
Represented By: Ray L. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTHER A. L. VERBOVSZKY
Represented By: Ray L. Weber
Represented By: Laura J. Gentilcore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?