BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. v. ROAD STAR TRANSPORT INC. et al
Plaintiff: BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.
Defendant: ROAD STAR TRANSPORT INC. and RANA SINGH
Case Number: 1:2020cv00170
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Dismissal without prejudice as to Count Three of the Complaint Only, filed by Plaintiff BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. (Haney, James)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - The defendant is granted to and including April 7, 2020 within which to respond to the Complaint. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/10/2020. (AAS)
March 9, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 7, 2020 , filed by Defendant RANA SINGH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hester, Jeffrey)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on April 6, 2020 at 11:00 a.m., Indianapolis Time (EST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/26/2020.(AAS) Modified on 2/26/2020 (AAS).
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Road Star Transport Inc. only, filed by Plaintiff BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Haney, James)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant RANA SINGH. (Hester, Jeffrey)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Michael Hester on behalf of Defendant RANA SINGH. (Hester, Jeffrey)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. RANA SINGH served on 1/22/2020. (Haney, James)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. ROAD STAR TRANSPORT INC. served on 1/22/2020. (Haney, James)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ROAD STAR TRANSPORT INC., RANA SINGH. (REO)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BMO FINANCIAL CORP. for BMO HARRIS BANK N.A... (Haney, James)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James K. Haney on behalf of Plaintiff BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. (Haney, James)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROAD STAR TRANSPORT INC., RANA SINGH, filed by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5812803) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement 1, #2 Exhibit B - Agreement 2, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement 3, #4 Exhibit D - Agreement 4, #5 Exhibit E - Continuing Guaranties, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Haney, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. v. ROAD STAR TRANSPORT INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROAD STAR TRANSPORT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANA SINGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.
Represented By: James K. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?