JAMES et al v. MEI-MGT, INC.
Plaintiff: REBECCA JAMES, GARRY JAMES and DETTLING CHARLES
Defendant: MEI-MGT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00180
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Yawanna N. McDonald for CHARLES DETTLING, GARRY JAMES and REBECCA JAMES added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, Yawanna N. McDonald is ordered to register within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Copy to Yawanna N. McDonald via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/12/2020. (SWM)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Andrew P. Campbell for CHARLES DETTLING, GARRY JAMES and REBECCA JAMES added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, Andrew P. Campbell is ordered to register within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Copy to Andrew P. Campbell via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/12/2020. (SWM)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney A. Todd Campbell for CHARLES DETTLING, GARRY JAMES and REBECCA JAMES added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, A. Todd Campbell is ordered to register within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Copy to A. Todd Campbell via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/12/2020. (SWM)
March 10, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Yawanna N. McDonald to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5899172), filed by Plaintiffs CHARLES DETTLING, GARRY JAMES, REBECCA JAMES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Drewry, Christopher)
March 10, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew P. Campbell to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5899157), filed by Plaintiffs CHARLES DETTLING, GARRY JAMES, REBECCA JAMES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Drewry, Christopher)
March 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) A. Todd Campbell to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5899133), filed by Plaintiffs CHARLES DETTLING, GARRY JAMES, REBECCA JAMES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Drewry, Christopher)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2020 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) on or before March 20, 2020 in the format set forth in the model CMP found on the Court's website (www.insd.uscourts.gov). Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines as set forth. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/20/2020. (GD)
February 18, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEI-MGT, INC.. (Roberts, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 ***PLEASE DISREGARD, REFILED AT #13 *** Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEI-MGT, INC. (Roberts, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/19/2020 (JDH).
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant MEI-MGT, INC.. (Roberts, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Roberts on behalf of Defendant MEI-MGT, INC.. (Roberts, Jeffrey)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MEI-MGT, INC., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Asset Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - 11-25-19 Update to Shareholders)(Drewry, Christopher)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file an Amended Complaint by February 6, 2020, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Courts diversity jurisdiction. Defendant need not answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint at which this Order is directed. Defendant is cautioned, however, that when it does respond to the Amended Complaint, and to the extent that it denies any of Plaintiffs jurisdictional allegations or states that it does not have sufficient information to respond to those allegations, the Court will require the parties to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement confirming that all parties are in agreement with the underlying jurisdictional allegations before the litigation moves forward. (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/27/2020.(JDH) Modified on 1/27/2020 (JDH).
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by All Plaintiffs. MEI-MGT, INC. served on 1/21/2020. (Drewry, Christopher)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET Amended, filed by Plaintiffs CHARLES DETTLING, GARRY JAMES, REBECCA JAMES. (Drewry, Christopher)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MEI-MGT, INC. (REO)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Steven Drewry on behalf of Plaintiffs DETTLING CHARLES, GARRY JAMES, REBECCA JAMES. (Drewry, Christopher)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against MEI-MGT, INC., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5814011) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Asset Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - 11-25-19 Update to Shareholders, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Drewry, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAMES et al v. MEI-MGT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA JAMES
Represented By: Christopher Steven Drewry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARRY JAMES
Represented By: Christopher Steven Drewry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DETTLING CHARLES
Represented By: Christopher Steven Drewry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEI-MGT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?