NATURAL PACK, INC. et al v. SYNDICATE SALES, INC, et al
Plaintiff: NATURAL PACK, INC.
Defendant: SYNDICATE SALES, INC., DOES 1-10, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, DAVID C CLARK, LAURA D SHINALL, MICHAEL A WILLIAMS, GUY MARKUS and DEL DEMAREE, JR.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00219
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
2 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 115 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #114 MOTION to Seal Document #37 Reply in Support of Motion, #113 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc), #110 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc), #39 Reply in Support of Motion, #112 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc), #111 S , filed by Plaintiff NATURAL PACK, INC.. (Orlowski, Alexander)
March 13, 2020 Filing 114 MOTION to Seal Document #37 Reply in Support of Motion, #113 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc), #110 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc), #39 Reply in Support of Motion, #112 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc), #111 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc), #95 Exhibit in Support, #92 Exhibit in Support , filed by Plaintiff NATURAL PACK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orlowski, Alexander)
March 13, 2020 Filing 113 SEALED Declaration of Uri Dolev in Support of Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.'s Reply to Defendants' Joint Opposition to #72 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff NATURAL PACK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Emails, #2 Exhibit B - Moss Dye Notes, #3 Exhibit C - Photograph, #4 Exhibit D - Photograph, #5 Exhibit E - Photographs, #6 Exhibit F - Photographs, #7 Exhibit G - Photograph, #8 Exhibit H - Photographs, #9 Exhibit I - Supplier Letter, #10 Exhibit J - Photograph, #11 Exhibit K - Sourcing travel expenses, #12 Exhibit L- Glassdoor.com, #13 Exhibit M - Syndicate Sales website excerpt, #14 Exhibit N - Syndicate Sales profile, #15 Exhibit O - Hurryin' Hoosier Transport website page, #16 Exhibit P - Hurryin' Hoosier Transport)(Edwards, Charles) Modified on 3/16/2020 - Added link to #72 (NAD).
March 13, 2020 Filing 112 SEALED Declaration of Mark Koch in Support of Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.'s Reply to Defendants' Joint Opposition to #72 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff NATURAL PACK, INC. (Edwards, Charles) Modified on 3/16/2020 - Added link to #72 (NAD).
March 13, 2020 Filing 111 SEALED Evidentiary Objections in support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Joint Opposition to #72 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff NATURAL PACK, INC. (Edwards, Charles) Modified on 3/16/2020 - Added link to #72 (NAD).
March 13, 2020 Filing 110 SEALED Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.'s Reply to Defendants' Joint Opposition to #72 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff NATURAL PACK, INC.. (Edwards, Charles) Modified on 3/16/2020 - Added link to #72 (NAD).
March 13, 2020 Filing 109 REDACTION Declaration of Uri Dolev in Support of Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.'s Reply to Defendants' Joint Opposition to #72 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by NATURAL PACK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted, #2 Exhibit B - Redacted, #3 Exhibit C - Redacted, #4 Exhibit D - Redacted, #5 Exhibit E - Redacted, #6 Exhibit F - Redacted, #7 Exhibit G - Redacted, #8 Exhibit H - Redacted, #9 Exhibit I - Redacted, #10 Exhibit J - Redacted, #11 Exhibit K - Redacted, #12 Exhibit L - Glassdoor.com printout, #13 Exhibit M - Syndicate Sales website excerpt, #14 Exhibit N - Syndicate Sales profile, #15 Exhibit O - Hurryin' Hoosier Transport website page, #16 Exhibit P - Hurryin' Hoosier Transport)(Edwards, Charles) Modified on 3/16/2020 - Added link to #72 and #113 (NAD).
March 13, 2020 Filing 108 REDACTION Declaration of Mark Koch in Support of Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.'s Reply to Defendants' Joint Opposition to #72 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by NATURAL PACK, INC. (Edwards, Charles) Modified on 3/16/2020 - Added link to #72 & #112 (NAD).
March 13, 2020 Filing 107 DECLARATION of Debbie Rick in support of Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.'s Reply to Defendants' Joint Opposition to #72 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by NATURAL PACK, INC. (Edwards, Charles) Modified on 3/16/2020 - Added link to #72 (NAD).
March 13, 2020 Filing 106 DECLARATION of James Vaughn in support of Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.'s Reply to Defendants' Joint Opposition to #72 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by NATURAL PACK, INC. (Edwards, Charles) Modified on 3/16/2020 - Added link to #72 (NAD).
March 13, 2020 Filing 105 DECLARATION of Ira M. Steinberg in Support of Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.'s Reply to Defendants' Joint Opposition to #72 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by NATURAL PACK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Syndicate Sales records)(Edwards, Charles) Modified on 3/16/2020 - Added link to #72 (NAD).
March 13, 2020 Filing 104 REDACTION Evidentiary Objections in support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Joint Opposition to #72 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by NATURAL PACK, INC. (Edwards, Charles) Modified on 3/16/2020 - Added link to #72 & #111 (NAD).
March 13, 2020 Filing 103 REPLY in Support of Motion re #72 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction /Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Redacted Reply to Defendants' Joint Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction), filed by Plaintiff NATURAL PACK, INC. (Edwards, Charles) Modified on 3/16/2020 - Added link to #110 (NAD).
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/13/2020.(SWM)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Copies via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/13/2020.(SWM)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 1/8/2021. Discovery due by 11/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/13/2020.(SWM)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by counsel for an Initial Pretrial Conference on March 10, 2020. The Court will approve the Case Management Plan, by separate order, with the changes to which the parties have agreed. This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on June 16, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. In addition, this matter is scheduled for a settlement conference on December 3, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. (Eastern), in Room 255, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 UNIFORM STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #96 APPROVED AND SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/11/2020.(SWM)
March 10, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Ira M. Steinberg hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. and Proof of Service (Steinberg, Ira)
March 9, 2020 Filing 96 Consent MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Plaintiff NATURAL PACK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orlowski, Alexander)
March 6, 2020 Filing 95 EXHIBIT in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion re #72 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction /Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof in the form of Second Declaration of Neil Spingarn in Support of Defendants' Joint Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction as filed in Central District of California, filed by Defendants DAVID C CLARK, DEL DEMAREE, JR, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, LAURA D SHINALL, SYNDICATE SALES, INC., MICHAEL A WILLIAMS. (Terpstra, John)
March 6, 2020 Filing 94 DECLARATION of Brian C. Vanderhoof in the form of Notice of Errata as filed in Central District of California re #93 Exhibit in Support by DAVID C CLARK, DEL DEMAREE, JR, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, LAURA D SHINALL, SYNDICATE SALES, INC., MICHAEL A WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Declaration of Brian C. Vanderhoof in Support of Defendants' Joint Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Terpstra, John)
March 6, 2020 Filing 93 EXHIBIT in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion re #72 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction /Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof consisting of Second Declaration of Brian C. Vanderhoof in Support of Defendants' Joint Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction as filed in Central District of California, filed by Defendants DAVID C CLARK, DEL DEMAREE, JR, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, LAURA D SHINALL, SYNDICATE SALES, INC., MICHAEL A WILLIAMS. (Terpstra, John)
March 6, 2020 Filing 92 EXHIBIT in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion re #72 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction /Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof as filed in Central District of California, filed by Defendants DAVID C CLARK, DEL DEMAREE, JR, DOES, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, LAURA D SHINALL, SYNDICATE SALES, INC., MICHAEL A WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Exhibit 1) - Declaration of Laura Shinall in Support of Defendants' Joint Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Affidavit (Exhibit 2) - Declaration of Markus Guy in Support of Defendants' Joint Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Affidavit (Exhibit 3) - Declaration of Melanie Spilbeler in Support of Defendants' Joint Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Affidavit (Exhibit 4) - Declaration of Tom Nielsen in Support of Defendants' Joint Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Affidavit (Exhibit 5) - Declaration of Brian C. Vanderhoof in Support of Defendants' Joint Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Brian C. Vanderhoof, #7 Affidavit (Exhibit 6) - Declaration of Neil Spingarn in Support of Defendants' Joint Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #8 Exhibit A to Declaration of Neil Spingarn, #9 Exhibit B to Declaration of Neil Spingarn, #10 Affidavit (Exhibit 7) - Declaration of Michael Kunkel in Support of Defendants' Joint Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #11 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael Kunkel, #12 Exhibit B to Declaration of Michael Kunkel, #13 Exhibit C to Declaration of Michael Kunkel)(Terpstra, John)
March 6, 2020 Filing 91 SEALED Defendants' Joint Response in Opposition as Filed in Central District of California, re #72 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendants DAVID C CLARK, DEL DEMAREE, JR, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, LAURA D SHINALL, SYNDICATE SALES, INC., MICHAEL A WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Joint Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Sealed), #2 Affidavit (Exhibit 2) - Declaration of [Confidential] (Sealed), #3 Affidavit (Exhibit 3) - Declaration of Delmar E. Demaree (Sealed), #4 Affidavit (Exhibit 4) - Declaration of John Fountain (Sealed), #5 Affidavit (Exhibit 5) - Declaration of Nathan (Sealed), #6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Nathan Keyton (Sealed), #7 Exhibit B to Declaration of Nathan Keyton (Sealed), #8 Exhibit C to Declaration of Nathan Keyton (Sealed), #9 Affidavit (Exhibit 6) - Declaration of Trent Harshman (Sealed), #10 Exhibit A to Declaration of Trent Harshman (Sealed), #11 Exhibit (Exhibit 7) - Evidentiary Objections, #12 Exhibit (Exhibit 8) - Proposed Order on Evidentiary Objections)(Terpstra, John)
March 6, 2020 Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re #72 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction /Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof , unredacted documents not under seal as filed in Central District of California, filed by Defendants DAVID C CLARK, DEL DEMAREE, JR, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, LAURA D SHINALL, SYNDICATE SALES, INC., MICHAEL A WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Application for Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants' Joint Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Redacted), #3 Affidavit (Exhibit 3) - Declaration of [Confidential] (Redacted), #4 Affidavit (Exhibit 4) - Declaration of Delmar E. Demaree (Redacted), #5 Affidavit (Exhibit 5) - Declaration of John Fountain (Redacted), #6 Affidavit (Exhibit 6) - Declaration of Nathan (Redacted), #7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Nathan Keyton (Redacted), #8 Exhibit B to Declaration of Nathan Keyton (Redacted), #9 Exhibit C to Declaration of Nathan Keyton (Redacted), #10 Affidavit (Exhibit 7) - Declaration of Trent Harshman (Redacted), #11 Exhibit A to Declaration of Trent Harshman (Redacted), #12 Exhibit (Exhibit 8) - Evidentiary Objections, #13 Exhibit (Exhibit 9) - Proposed Order on Evidentiary Objections)(Terpstra, John)
March 6, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE of Filing pursuant to Court's Order [Dkt. 62] of Re-Filing Opposition and Supporting Documents in Response to Pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction by DAVID C CLARK, DEL DEMAREE, JR, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, LAURA D SHINALL, SYNDICATE SALES, INC., MICHAEL A WILLIAMS (Terpstra, John)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting Angeli C. Aragon's #85 Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of GUY MARKUS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/5/2020. (SWM)
March 4, 2020 Filing 87 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #86 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Per FRCP 12(b)(6) , filed by Defendant GUY MARKUS. (Rasp, Kevin)
March 4, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Per FRCP 12(b)(6), filed by Defendant GUY MARKUS. (Rasp, Kevin)
March 4, 2020 Filing 85 Amended MOTION for Attorney(s) Angeli C. Aragon to Appear pro hac vice for Guy Markus (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Defendant GUY MARKUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Angeli C. Aragon with Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting)(Rasp, Kevin)
March 4, 2020 Filing 84 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #83 MOTION for Determination of Law - Choice of Law , filed by Defendants DAVID C CLARK, DEL DEMAREE, JR, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, GUY MARKUS, LAURA D SHINALL, SYNDICATE SALES, INC., MICHAEL A WILLIAMS. (Lake, Donald)
March 4, 2020 Filing 83 MOTION for Determination of Law - Choice of Law, filed by Defendants DAVID C CLARK, DEL DEMAREE, JR, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, GUY MARKUS, LAURA D SHINALL, SYNDICATE SALES, INC., MICHAEL A WILLIAMS. (Lake, Donald)
March 4, 2020 Filing 82 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #81 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants DAVID C CLARK, DEL DEMAREE, JR, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, GUY MARKUS, LAURA D SHINALL, SYNDICATE SALES, INC., MICHAEL A WILLIAMS. (Lake, Donald)
March 4, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants DAVID C CLARK, DEL DEMAREE, JR, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, GUY MARKUS, LAURA D SHINALL, SYNDICATE SALES, INC., MICHAEL A WILLIAMS. (Lake, Donald)
March 4, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald E. Lake, III on behalf of Defendants DAVID C CLARK, DEL DEMAREE, JR, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, LAURA D SHINALL, SYNDICATE SALES, INC., MICHAEL A WILLIAMS. (Lake, Donald)
March 3, 2020 Filing 79 JOINTLY FILED PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants DAVID C CLARK, DEL DEMAREE, JR, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, GUY MARKUS, LAURA D SHINALL, SYNDICATE SALES, INC., MICHAEL A WILLIAMS and PLAINTIFF NATURAL PACK, INC.. (Terpstra, John)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: This matter has come before the Court on motion of Angeli C. Aragon of O'Hagan Meyer, seeking an order granting leave to appear pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing as counsel on behalf of the Defendant, Guy Markus, in the above-styled cause only, Dkt. [ #69 ]. In her Certification, the applicant did not include any federal or state courts to which she is admitted, so the Court is unable to determine whether she may properly appear pro hac vice in this matter. Accordingly, the motion is DENIED. Copy to Angeli C. Aragon via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 2/28/2020. (SWM)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: This matter has come before the Court on motion of Clinton D. Robison of O'Hagan Meyer, seeking an order granting leave to appear pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing as counsel on behalf of the Defendant, Guy Markus, in the above-styled cause only, Dkt. [ #68 ]. In his Certification, the applicant did not include any federal or state courts to which he is admitted, so the Court is unable to determine whether he may properly appear pro hac vice in this matter. Accordingly, the motion is DENIED. Copy to Clinton D. Robison via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 2/28/2020. (SWM)
February 27, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Christopher Rasp on behalf of Defendant GUY MARKUS. (Rasp, Kevin)
February 26, 2020 Filing 74 REDACTION to #73 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) Redacted Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by NATURAL PACK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit C - Decl. of Uri Dolev, #4 Exhibit D - Decl. of Amy Staley, #5 Exhibit E - Decl. of Lana Jackson, #6 Exhibit F - Decl. of Melissa Franzen, #7 Exhibit G - Decl. of Sascha Sarnoff, #8 Exhibit H - Decl. of James Vaughn, #9 Exhibit I - Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit J - Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit K - Filed Under Seal)(Edwards, Charles)
February 26, 2020 Filing 73 SEALED Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, re #72 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff NATURAL PACK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit C - Decl. of Uri Dolev, #4 Exhibit D - Decl. of Amy Staley, #5 Exhibit E - Decl. of Lana Jackson, #6 Exhibit F - Decl. of Melissa Franzen, #7 Exhibit G - Decl. of Sascha Sarnoff, #8 Exhibit H - Decl. of James Vaughn, #9 Exhibit I - Decl. of Bill Hall, #10 Exhibit J - Decl. of Mark Koch, #11 Exhibit K - Decl. of Rod Rethwill)(Edwards, Charles)
February 26, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction /Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, filed by Plaintiff NATURAL PACK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edwards, Charles)
February 26, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Refiling Pending Motions by NATURAL PACK, INC. (Edwards, Charles)
February 25, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Extension Pursuant to L.R. 6-1(b), filed by Defendants DAVID C CLARK, DEL DEMAREE, JR, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, LAURA D SHINALL, SYNDICATE SALES, INC., MICHAEL A WILLIAMS (Terpstra, John)
February 25, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION for Attorney(s) Angeli Aragon to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number NA004220), filed by Defendant GUY MARKUS. (Attachments: #1 Propsed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Envelope)(TMC)
February 25, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION for Attorney(s) Clinton Robison to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number NA004220), filed by Defendant GUY MARKUS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Envelope)(TMC)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2020 03:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional details. Copies via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 2/24/2020.(SWM) Modified on 2/25/2020 (SWM).
February 24, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Stuart Morrisson on behalf of Defendant SYNDICATE SALES, INC.. (Morrisson, Scott)
February 24, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc T. Quigley on behalf of Defendant SYNDICATE SALES, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting Ira M. Steinberg's #63 Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of NATURAL PACK, INC. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Ira M. Steinberg via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 2/21/2020. (SWM)
February 13, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ira M. Steinberg to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5858619), filed by Plaintiff NATURAL PACK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Ira M. Steinberg, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Edwards, Charles)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER - In accordance with Local Rule 16-2, which provides that within 21 days after the court receives a case remanded by the court of appeals for further proceedings, or that is transferred from another district, each party must file a statement of position as to what action the court should take in the case. Plaintiffs have complied. Although the deadline has passed, the Defendants' position statement would be helpful and Defendants are given until February 26, 2020 to file a position statement. Additionally, any pending motions shall be refiled in this matter no later than February 26, 2020. Previously filed responses shall be re-filed no later than March 6, 2020. Previously filed replies shall be re-filed no later than March 13, 2020. Counsel shall remove CM/ECF headers prior to re-filing. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/12/2020.(NAD) Modified on 2/13/2020 - Copies mailed via US Mail per distribution list (NAD).
February 12, 2020 Filing 61 REPORT Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2 by DAVID C CLARK, DEL DEMAREE, JR, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, LAURA D SHINALL, SYNDICATE SALES, INC., MICHAEL A WILLIAMS. (Terpstra, John)
February 12, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Terpstra on behalf of Defendants DAVID C CLARK, DEL DEMAREE, JR, THOMAS C LUNSFORD, LAURA D SHINALL, SYNDICATE SALES, INC., MICHAEL A WILLIAMS. (Terpstra, John)
February 12, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Tanya Walton Pratt. Judge James R. Sweeney II is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-cv-00219-TWP-DLP, on all future filings in this matter. (REO)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 2/12/2020. (BRR)
February 11, 2020 Filing 57 REPORT Plaintiff's Local Rule 16-2 Report by NATURAL PACK, INC.. (Edwards, Charles)
February 10, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Pape Orlowski on behalf of Plaintiff NATURAL PACK, INC.. (Orlowski, Alexander)
February 10, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles P. Edwards on behalf of Plaintiff NATURAL PACK, INC.. (Edwards, Charles)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Application, Sealed Declaration, Reply #46 , #47 , #48 , for the following reasons: Other: Document #47 was not delivered to the Court. Document #48 -if it is part of the Application #46 then it should not be filed until leave of Court is granted. Otherwise, it should not include the words: REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL. (see document for further) (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #49 EX PARTE APPLICATION: IT IS SO ORDERED. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 49 EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Guy Markus, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Redacted Document Defendants' Joint Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Redacted Document Declaration of [Confidential] ISO Defendants Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Redacted Document Declaration of Delmar E. Demaree III ISO Defendants Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Redacted Document Declaration of John Fountain ISO Defendants Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Redacted Document Declaration of Nathan Keyton ISO Defendants Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Redacted Document Exhibit A to Redacted Declaration of Nathan Keyton, #8 Redacted Document Exhibit B to Redacted Declaration of Nathan Keyton, #9 Redacted Document Exhibit C to Redacted Declaration of Nathan Keyton, #10 Redacted Document Declaration of Trent Harshman ISO Defendants Joint Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #11 Redacted Document Exhibit A to Redacted Declaration of Trent Harshman iSO Defendants Joint Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #12 Redacted Document Evidentiary Objections ISO Defendants Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #13 Redacted Document Proposed Order on Evidentiary Objections Submitted by Defendants ISO Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Vanderhoof, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 48 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 1/16/20. REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #24 filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Evidentiary Objections, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Declaration, #8 Exhibit, #9 Proof of Service)(Steinberg, Ira) Modified on 1/16/2020 (bm). [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 47 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 1/16/20. SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #46 filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document, #3 Unredacted Document, #4 Unredacted Document, #5 Unredacted Document, #6 Proof of Service)(Steinberg, Ira) Modified on 1/16/2020 (bm). [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 46 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 1/16/20. APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Declaration of Mark Koch ISO Pltf's Reply to Def's Oppo to Mtn, #2 Redacted Document Declaration of Uri Dolev ISO Pltf's Reply to Defs' Oppo to Mtn for PI, #3 Redacted Document Exhibits to Declaration of Uri Dolev, #4 Redacted Document Evidentiary Objections ISO Pltf's Reply to Def's Oppo to Mtn for PI, #5 Redacted Document Pltf's Reply to Def's Joint Oppo to Mtn for PI, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Proof of Service)(Steinberg, Ira) Modified on 1/16/2020 (bm). [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 45 Markus' Response to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss UNDER F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) Or, In The Altnernative, to Change Venue Pursuan To 28 U.S.C. 1401(a) #11 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss UNDER F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) Or, In The Altnernative, to Change Venue Pursuan To 28 U.S.C. 1401(a) #11 and NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss #12 filed by Defendant Guy Markus. (Robison, Clint) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 44 Response to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections in support re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss UNDER F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) Or, In The Altnernative, to Change Venue Pursuan To 28 U.S.C. 1401(a) #11 filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams. (Vanderhoof, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 43 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss UNDER F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) Or, In The Altnernative, to Change Venue Pursuan To 28 U.S.C. 1401(a) #11 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss UNDER F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) Or, In The Altnernative, to Change Venue Pursuan To 28 U.S.C. 1401(a) #11 and NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss #12 filed by Defendant Guy Markus. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Saul Mondargon ISO Reply)(Robison, Clint) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 42 REPLY reply in support of motion to dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss UNDER F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) Or, In The Altnernative, to Change Venue Pursuan To 28 U.S.C. 1401(a) #11 filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Vanderhoof, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION To Seal #35 , Sealed Declaration #36 , for the following reasons: Other: Documents missing header to reflect correct docket number; documents missing, including 35-7 through 35-10; 35-12; 35/13; 35-14; envelopes missing. Local Rules regarding the filing of sealed documents in civil cases were significanly amended. Please review LR 79-5.2 and familiarize yourself with the Court's Guide to Electronically Filing Under Seal Documents in Civil Cases, available on the Court's website under Filing>Sealed Documents. If you still have questions, please email the Help Desk at ecf-helpdesk@cacd.uscourts.gov (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams. correcting Declaration (Motion related), #38 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Vanderhoof, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Second Declaration of Neil Spingarn In Support of Defendants' Motion For Preliminary Injuction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #24 filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams. (Vanderhoof, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Second Declaration of Brian C. Vanderhoof In Support of Defendants' Response To Motion For Preliminary Injuction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #24 filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams. (Vanderhoof, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 37 DECLARATION In Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #24 filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Guy Markus, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Declaration, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Declaration, #11 Exhibit A, #12 Exhibit B, #13 Exhibit C)(Vanderhoof, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 36 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 1/10/20. SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #35 filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Guy Markus, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Declaration, #11 Exhibit A, #12 Unredacted Document, #13 Proposed Order)(Vanderhoof, Brian) Modified on 1/13/2020 (bm). [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 35 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 1/10/20. APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Guy Markus, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams. Application set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Declaration, #12 Exhibit A, #13 Redacted Document, #14 Redacted Document, #15 Proposed Order)(Attorney Brian C Vanderhoof added to party Guy Markus(pty:dft))(Vanderhoof, Brian) Modified on 1/13/2020 (bm). [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 34 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss UNDER F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) Or, In The Altnernative, to Change Venue Pursuan To 28 U.S.C. 1401(a) #11 and NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss #12 filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Objections ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Def's Ntc of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proof of Service)(Steinberg, Ira) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 33 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss UNDER F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) Or, In The Altnernative, to Change Venue Pursuan To 28 U.S.C. 1401(a) #11 filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Objection ISO Opposition to Defendants' Ntc of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jonathan Dolev, #3 Declaration Declaration of Uri Dolev, #4 Exhibit Exhibits ISO Declaration of Uri Dolev, #5 Proof of Service)(Steinberg, Ira) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND ALL OTHER PROCEEDINGS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez denying #29 EX PARTE APPLICATION: DENIED. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 31 Opposition to Ex Parte Application re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Stay Discovery And All Other Proceedings Pending The Courtt's Determination On The Threshold Issue of Personal Jurisdiction Presented In Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Or In The Alternative To Continue The #29 filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ira M. Steinberg, #2 Proof of Service)(Steinberg, Ira) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Stay Discovery And All Other Proceedings Pending The Courtt's Determination On The Threshold Issue of Personal Jurisdiction Presented In Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Or In The Alternative To Continue The #29 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vanderhoof, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 29 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Stay Discovery And All Other Proceedings Pending The Courtt's Determination On The Threshold Issue of Personal Jurisdiction Presented In Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Or In The Alternative To Continue The Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Del Demaree, Jr., Laura D. Shinall, David C. Clark, Michael A. Williams, Thomas C. Lunsford Syndicate Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian C. Vanderhoof, #2 Declaration OF Laura Shinall) (Vanderhoof, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Donald E. "Tripp" Lake III APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Syndicate Sales, Inc., Del Demaree, Jr., Laura D. Shinall, David C. Clark, Michael A. Williams, Thomas C. Lunsford, designating Thomas S Kidde as local counsel. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #22 Non-Resident Attorney Donald E. "Tripp" Lake III APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Syndicate Sales, Inc., Del Demaree, Jr., Laura D. Shinall, David C. Clark, Michael A. Williams, Thomas C. Lansford, designating Thomas S Kidde as local counsel. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc., re Sealed Document, 25 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction served on 11/12/19. (Steinberg, Ira) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Steinberg, Ira) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #14 APPLICATION (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Donald E. "Tripp" Lake III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 11/7/2019, Receipt No. 26LCG1SP) filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Applicaton of Non-Resident Attorney In A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Kidde, Thomas) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Donald E."Tripp" Lake III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams (Pro Hac Vice F #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Donald E."Tripp" Lake III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24745500) filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear In A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Kidde, Thomas) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, 17 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration 16 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration 15 served on November 5, 2019. (Steinberg, Ira) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc., (Steinberg, Ira) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL)(Steinberg, Ira) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff Natural Pack, Inc... (Steinberg, Ira) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss UNDER F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) Or, In The Altnernative, to Change Venue Pursuan To 28 U.S.C. 1401(a) #11 and NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss UNDER F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) filed by Defendant Guy Markus. Motion set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of Guy Markus in Support thereof, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Attorney Clint D Robison added to party Guy Markus(pty:dft)) (Robison, Clint) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss UNDER F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) Or, In The Altnernative, to Change Venue Pursuan To 28 U.S.C. 1401(a) filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Guy Markus, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams. Motion set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Dismiss Under F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) Or, In The Alternative, to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A), #2 Declaration of Michael A. Williams In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or Transfer, #3 Declaration of Guy Markus n Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or Transfer, #4 Declaration of Del Demarre, Jr., n Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or Transfer, #5 Declaration of Larua D. Shinall n Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or Transfer, #6 Declaration of Thomas C. Clark n Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or Transfer, #7 Declaration of Thomas C. Lunsford n Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or Transfer, #8 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(2) Or, In The Alternative, to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1401(a)) (Kidde, Thomas) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Case number and judge's initials are missing from caption of attached document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc.. (Vanderhoof, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants' David C. Clark, Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., identifying Natural Pack, Inc.; Syndicate Sales, Inc.; Del Demaree, Jr.; Laura D. Shinall; David C. Clark; Michael A. Williams; Thomas C. Lundsford; Guy Markus. (Vanderhoof, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Civil Cover Sheet lacks signature. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Case Cover Sheet with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 10/15/2019, receipt number 26KSUB62), filed by Defendants Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Del Demaree, Jr., Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams.(Vanderhoof, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 * CIVIL COVER SHEET * attached instead of Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Del Demaree, Jr., Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams, identifying Natural Pack, Inc; Syndicate Sales, Inc.; Del Demaree, Jr.; Laura D. Shinall; Michael A. Williams; Thomas C. Lunsford; Guy Markus. (Vanderhoof, Brian) Modified on 10/16/2019 (esa). [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superiour Court of the State of California County of Los Angeles, Central District, case number 19STCV32476 Receipt No: 0973-24609981 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Thomas C. Lunsford, Laura D. Shinall, Del Demaree, Jr., Syndicate Sales, Inc., Michael A. Williams. (Attorney Brian C Vanderhoof added to party Del Demaree, Jr.(pty:bkmov), Attorney Brian C Vanderhoof added to party Thomas C. Lunsford(pty:bkmov), Attorney Brian C Vanderhoof added to party Laura D. Shinall(pty:bkmov), Attorney Brian C Vanderhoof added to party Syndicate Sales, Inc.(pty:bkmov), Attorney Brian C Vanderhoof added to party Michael A. Williams(pty:bkmov))(Vanderhoof, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 1/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATURAL PACK, INC. et al v. SYNDICATE SALES, INC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNDICATE SALES, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN C VANDERHOOF
Represented By: THOMAS S KIDDE
Represented By: DANIEL C DECARLO
Represented By: DONALD E LAKE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS C LUNSFORD
Represented By: BRIAN C VANDERHOOF
Represented By: THOMAS S KIDDE
Represented By: DANIEL C DECARLO
Represented By: DONALD E LAKE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID C CLARK
Represented By: BRIAN C VANDERHOOF
Represented By: THOMAS S KIDDE
Represented By: DANIEL C DECARLO
Represented By: DONALD E LAKE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA D SHINALL
Represented By: BRIAN C VANDERHOOF
Represented By: THOMAS S KIDDE
Represented By: DANIEL C DECARLO
Represented By: DONALD E LAKE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL A WILLIAMS
Represented By: BRIAN C VANDERHOOF
Represented By: THOMAS S KIDDE
Represented By: DANIEL C DECARLO
Represented By: DONALD E LAKE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUY MARKUS
Represented By: CLINT D ROBISON
Represented By: BRIAN C VANDERHOOF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEL DEMAREE, JR.
Represented By: BRIAN C VANDERHOOF
Represented By: THOMAS S KIDDE
Represented By: DANIEL C DECARLO
Represented By: DONALD E LAKE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATURAL PACK, INC.
Represented By: IRA M STEINBERG
Represented By: PIERCE HENRY O'DONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?