ROCCHIO v. E&B PAVING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JOHN A. ROCCHIO
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 103 and E&B PAVING, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00417
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 17 Defendant E&B Paving, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by E&B PAVING, LLC.(Ernst, Kayla)
April 2, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 103.(Vlink, David)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2020 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the Initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/27/2020.(SWM)
March 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 103. (Vlink, David)
March 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Vlink on behalf of Defendant INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 103. (Vlink, David)
February 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant E&B PAVING, LLC. (Ernst, Kayla)
February 28, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E&B PAVING, LLC identifying Corporate Parent IMI CONSTRUCTION, LLC for E&B PAVING, LLC.. (Ernst, Kayla)
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kayla Ernst on behalf of Defendant E&B PAVING, LLC. (Ernst, Kayla)
February 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan McCabe Poor on behalf of Defendant E&B PAVING, LLC. (Poor, Ryan)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by JOHN A. ROCCHIO. E&B PAVING, LLC served on 2/10/2020. (Stake, Christopher)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by JOHN A. ROCCHIO. INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 103 served on 2/10/2020. (Stake, Christopher)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to E&B PAVING, LLC, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 103. (REO)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Stake on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN A. ROCCHIO. (Stake, Christopher)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann DeLaney on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN A. ROCCHIO. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against E&B PAVING, LLC, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 103, filed by JOHN A. ROCCHIO. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5844700) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Collective Bargaining Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(DeLaney, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROCCHIO v. E&B PAVING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN A. ROCCHIO
Represented By: Kathleen Ann DeLaney
Represented By: Christopher S. Stake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 103
Represented By: David T. Vlink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E&B PAVING, LLC
Represented By: Kayla Ernst
Represented By: Ryan McCabe Poor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?