DUNHAM RUBBER & BELTING CORPORATION v. PAYCHEX INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DUNHAM RUBBER & BELTING CORPORATION
Defendant: PAYCHEX INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. and LANCE P. LITTLE
Case Number: 1:2020cv00440
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 19 Defendants Answer and Affirmative and other Defenses ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint , filed by PAYCHEX INSURANCE AGENCY, INC..(Seidler, Robert)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW DKT NO. #16 - This matter is before the Court on the MOTION TO WITHDRAW DKT. NO. #16 filed by Plaintiff, Dunham Rubber & Belting Corporation. The Court, having reviewed the same and being duly advised in the premises, now GRANTS said Motion. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the pleading submitted (under Dkt. No. #16 ) is withdrawn and vacated. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/23/2020. (NAD)
March 20, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw #16 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Lance P. Little Only , filed by Plaintiff DUNHAM RUBBER & BELTING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morse, John)
March 19, 2020 Filing 16 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER AT #18 *** MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Lance P. Little Only, filed by Plaintiff DUNHAM RUBBER & BELTING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Morse, John) Modified on 3/23/2020 (NAD).
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by DUNHAM RUBBER & BELTING CORPORATION. LANCE P. LITTLE served on 2/13/2020. (Morse, John)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2020 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadline and additional details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/4/2020.(SWM)
March 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant PAYCHEX INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.. (Seidler, Robert)
March 2, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PAYCHEX INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Paychex Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Paychex, Inc. for PAYCHEX INSURANCE AGENCY, INC... (Seidler, Robert)
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary A. Ahonen on behalf of Defendant PAYCHEX INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.. (Ahonen, Zachary)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Seidler on behalf of Defendant PAYCHEX INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.. (Seidler, Robert)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DUNHAM RUBBER & BELTING CORPORATION. (Morse, John)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DUNHAM RUBBER & BELTING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morse, John)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTRY ON JURISDICTION - It has come to the Court's attention that Plaintiff's Complaint fails to allege all of the facts necessary to determine whether this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case. The Complaint alleges that this Court has jurisdiction based upon diversity of citizenship. However, the Complaint fails to sufficiently allege the citizenship of the parties. Citizenship is the operative consideration for jurisdictional purposes. Therefore, the Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement that establishes the Court's jurisdiction over this case. This statement should specifically identify the citizenship of the parties. This jurisdictional statement is due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Entry. (See Entry.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/10/2020.(NAD)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LANCE P. LITTLE, and PAYCHEX INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. (DJH)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah L. Phillips on behalf of Plaintiff DUNHAM RUBBER & BELTING CORPORATION. (Phillips, Rebekah)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to LANCE P. LITTLE, PAYCHEX INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.. (Morse, John)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Morse on behalf of Plaintiff DUNHAM RUBBER & BELTING CORPORATION. (Morse, John)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DUNHAM RUBBER & BELTING CORPORATION. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5847282) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morse, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUNHAM RUBBER & BELTING CORPORATION v. PAYCHEX INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUNHAM RUBBER & BELTING CORPORATION
Represented By: Rebekah L. Phillips
Represented By: John Joseph Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAYCHEX INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.
Represented By: Zachary A. Ahonen
Represented By: Robert F. Seidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANCE P. LITTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?