INGRAM v. SAUL
Plaintiff: DAVID J. INGRAM
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2020cv00584
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER #10 - Defendant having filed an unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings, due notice given, and the Court advised in the premises: 1. The unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings is granted in part and denied in part. 2. In light of the global COVID-19 crisis, SSAs necessary suspension of in-office services to the public, and its resulting inability to prepare a certified transcript of the record in this matter, this Court hereby stays this proceeding for 60 days. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 4/17/2020. (JDC)
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Stay , filed by Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Alesia, Brian)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Alesia on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Alesia, Brian)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 3/20/2020. (JDC)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 Supplemental MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff DAVID J. INGRAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Monthly Expenses)(Vrana, Timothy)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Wierenga, Julian)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY - Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, ECF No. #3 , is DENIED. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). The application lists significant spousal income that appears to demonstrate the present ability to pay the fee. While the application lists dependent children in the household, the monthly expenses show only a mortgage payment and the presence of two outstanding debts. The form either does not list the monthly obligation on those debts or if the total listed is a monthly obligation, the application lacks enough information to show those obligations are met. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee, including the administrative fee, totaling $400 by the end of the day March 23, 2020 or submit a supplemental motion with a more complete accounting of the household finances. Failure to pay the filing fee may result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 2/24/2020. (JDC)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff DAVID J. INGRAM. (Vrana, Timothy)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Vrana on behalf of Plaintiff DAVID J. INGRAM. (Vrana, Timothy)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Review Decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by DAVID J. INGRAM. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vrana, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INGRAM v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID J. INGRAM
Represented By: Timothy J. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Represented By: Brian J. Alesia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?