ESTATE OF DEMARIO THOMAS v. GEO GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF DEMARIO THOMAS, DECEASED, BY ITS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, ROMONDO THOMAS and ESTATE OF DEMARIO THOMAS
Defendant: EMILY SCUDDER, JACK HOOD, KEITH BUTTS, THE GEO GROUP, INC. and GEO GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00592
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff ESTATE OF DEMARIO THOMAS AND DEFENDANTS. (Goodman, Ian)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE MORE THAN 25 INTERROGATORIES, filed by Plaintiff ESTATE OF DEMARIO THOMAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Interrogatories to The Geo Group, Inc., #2 Exhibit B - Interrogatories to Keith Butts, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodman, Ian)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on May 7, 2020 at 11:00 a.m., Indianapolis Time (EST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/11/2020.(AAS)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by EMILY SCUDDER, KEITH BUTTS, GEO GROUP, INC., JACK HOOD. EMILY SCUDDER waiver sent on 2/21/2020; KEITH BUTTS waiver sent on 2/21/2020; GEO GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 2/21/2020; JACK HOOD waiver sent on 2/21/2020. (Forrest, Adam)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Garth Forrest on behalf of Defendants KEITH BUTTS, GEO GROUP, INC., JACK HOOD, EMILY SCUDDER. (Forrest, Adam)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - The plaintiff has paid the filing fee and is represented by counsel. The Court has screened the complaint which shall proceed as presented. The plaintiff is responsible for effecting service on the defendants in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 2/28/2020.(DWH)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Bont on behalf of Plaintiff THE ESTATE OF DEMARIO THOMAS, DECEASED, BY ITS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, ROMONDO THOMAS. (Bont, Jonathan)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian P. Goodman on behalf of Plaintiff THE ESTATE OF DEMARIO THOMAS, DECEASED, BY ITS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, ROMONDO THOMAS. (Goodman, Ian)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEITH BUTTS, JACK HOOD, EMILY SCUDDER, THE GEO GROUP, INC., filed by THE ESTATE OF DEMARIO THOMAS, DECEASED, BY ITS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, ROMONDO THOMAS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5872717) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodman, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESTATE OF DEMARIO THOMAS v. GEO GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMILY SCUDDER
Represented By: Adam Garth Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK HOOD
Represented By: Adam Garth Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH BUTTS
Represented By: Adam Garth Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GEO GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Adam Garth Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF DEMARIO THOMAS, DECEASED, BY ITS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, ROMONDO THOMAS
Represented By: Jonathan A. Bont
Represented By: Ian P. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF DEMARIO THOMAS
Represented By: Jonathan A. Bont
Represented By: Ian P. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?