ANNIE OAKLEY ENTERPRISES INC. et al v. RISE-N-SHINE LLC et al
Plaintiff: ANNIE OAKLEY ENTERPRISES INC. and RENEE GABET
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC., CATHY BEGGAN, WALMART, INC. and RISE-N-SHINE LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00638
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Defendants' #19 Motion for Substitution of Counsel and Withdrawal of Appearance. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the appearance of Judy L. Woods and the law firm of Krieg DeVault LLP are hereby withdrawn as to defendants Cathy Began, Rise-N-Shine LLC, and Walmart Inc. Attorney Michael Swift of the law firm of Maginot, Moore & Beck, LLP has appeared for these and other defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/21/2020. (SWM)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Defendants' #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 4/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/20/2020. (SWM)
April 20, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Substitute Attorney , MOTION to Withdraw , filed by Defendants CATHY BEGGAN, RISE-N-SHINE LLC, WALMART, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel and Withdrawal of Appearance)(Woods, Judy)
April 17, 2020 Filing 18 First MOTION for Extension of Time to April 27, 2020 to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants AMAZON.COM, INC., CATHY BEGGAN, RISE-N-SHINE LLC, WALMART, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Swift, Michael)
April 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Swift on behalf of Defendants AMAZON.COM, INC., CATHY BEGGAN, RISE-N-SHINE LLC, WALMART, INC.. (Swift, Michael)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2020 11:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/13/2020.(SWM)
March 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant AMAZON.COM, INC.. (Cruzen, Robert)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - granting #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/20/2020. (CKM)
March 20, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Parties First Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendants CATHY BEGGAN, RISE-N-SHINE LLC, WALMART, INC.. (Woods, Judy) Modified on 3/23/2020 (JRB).
March 20, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART, INC.. (Woods, Judy)
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RISE-N-SHINE LLC. (Woods, Judy)
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Judy L. Woods on behalf of Defendants CATHY BEGGAN, RISE-N-SHINE LLC, WALMART, INC.. (Woods, Judy)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert T. Cruzen to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5913879), filed by Defendant AMAZON.COM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cruzen, Robert)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 RECEIPT #IP068552 for filing fee in the amount of $400.00, paid by Plaintiff. (DJH)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AMAZON.COM, INC., CATHY BEGGAN, RISE-N-SHINE LLC, AND WALMART, INC.. (JRB)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ANNIE OAKLEY ENTERPRISES INC., RENEE GABET. (Overhauser, Paul)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Ann Eich on behalf of Plaintiffs ANNIE OAKLEY ENTERPRISES INC., RENEE GABET. (Eich, Melanie)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B. Overhauser on behalf of Plaintiffs ANNIE OAKLEY ENTERPRISES INC., RENEE GABET. (Overhauser, Paul)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMAZON.COM, INC., CATHY BEGGAN, RISE-N-SHINE LLC, WALMART, INC., filed by ANNIE OAKLEY ENTERPRISES INC., RENEE GABET. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Screenshot of Annie Oakley Enterprises, Inc. Rise N Shine Custom Blend., #2 Exhibit 2-Registration No. 2,549,750: RISE N SHINE, #3 Exhibit 3-Registration No. 3,990,283: RISE N SHINE, #4 Exhibit 4-Compilation of Rise-N-Shine sample webpages of infringing products., #5 Exhibit 5-FTC v. Rise-N-Shine, LLC and Cathy Beggan Complaint for Permanent Injunction and Other Equitable Relief, #6 Exhibit 6-FTC v. Rise-N-Shine, LLC and Cathy Beggan Stipulated Final Judgment and Order, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons Summons-RISE-N-SHINE, #9 Proposed Summons Summons-Cathy Beggan, #10 Proposed Summons Summons Amazon.com Inc, #11 Proposed Summons Summons Walmart, Inc.)(Overhauser, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANNIE OAKLEY ENTERPRISES INC. et al v. RISE-N-SHINE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC.
Represented By: Michael A. Swift
Represented By: Robert T. Cruzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHY BEGGAN
Represented By: Michael A. Swift
Represented By: Judy L. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART, INC.
Represented By: Michael A. Swift
Represented By: Judy L. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RISE-N-SHINE LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Swift
Represented By: Judy L. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNIE OAKLEY ENTERPRISES INC.
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Represented By: Melanie Ann Eich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENEE GABET
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Represented By: Melanie Ann Eich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?