BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC v. CC FOOD ENTERPRISE LLC et al
Plaintiff: BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC
Defendant: CC FOOD ENTERPRISE LLC and KC GROUPS INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00711
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE AND ORDER - This matter is set for a TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE on MONDAY, MAY 11, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (EST) Indianapolis time, before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Defendants, CC Food Enterprise LLC and KC Groups Inc., are ORDERED to appear at the telephonic status conference alongside their counsel to discuss the pending Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance Dkt. #16 . Counsel is DIRECTED to provide Defendants with the information needed to dial into the call. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 5/1/2020.(AAS) Modified on 5/1/2020 (AAS).
April 30, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Defendants CC FOOD ENTERPRISE LLC, KC GROUPS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rollins, Amy)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on May 26, 2020 at 11:00 a.m., Indianapolis Time (EST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 4/15/2020.(AAS)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint to 5/1/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 4/2/2020. (JRB)
April 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Amy Ann Rollins hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Rollins, Amy)
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/1/2020 to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendants CC FOOD ENTERPRISE LLC, KC GROUPS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time)(Rollins, Amy)
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Ann Rollins on behalf of Defendants CC FOOD ENTERPRISE LLC, KC GROUPS INC.. (Rollins, Amy)
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint & Exhibits, Civil Forms, Appearances, Corporate Disclosure, and Magistrate Notice served on Kong Fu Chen for KC Groups Inc. on 03/11/2020, filed by BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC. (Klein, Steven)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint & Exhibits, Civil Forms, Appearances, Corporate Disclosure, and Magistrate Notice served on Kong Fu Chen for CC Food Enterprise LLC on 03/11/2020, filed by BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC. (Klein, Steven)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Steven E. Klein for BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/5/2020. (JRB)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to CC FOOD ENTERPRISE LLC, KC GROUPS INC. (REO)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC identifying Corporate Parent SINHDARELLA, INC., Corporate Parent RED CRAWFISH, INC for BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC.. (Guevara, Gregory)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven E. Klein to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5890302), filed by Plaintiff BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Steven E. Klein, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Guevara, Gregory)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip R. Zimmerly on behalf of Plaintiff BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC. (Zimmerly, Philip)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory W. Guevara on behalf of Plaintiff BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC. (Guevara, Gregory)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5890075) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - TBC Exteriors, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - TBC Interiors, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - TBC Menus, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - TBC Collateral, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - TBC Website, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - TBC Registrations, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Infringing Marks, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - TBC Infringing Menu, #9 Civil Cover Sheet , #10 Proposed Summons )(Guevara, Gregory) Modified on 3/5/2020 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC v. CC FOOD ENTERPRISE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CC FOOD ENTERPRISE LLC
Represented By: Amy Ann Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KC GROUPS INC.
Represented By: Amy Ann Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC
Represented By: Philip R. Zimmerly
Represented By: Gregory W. Guevara
Represented By: Steven E. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?