BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC v. THE MAD CRAB LLC
Plaintiff: BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC
Defendant: THE MAD CRAB LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00714
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Defendant's #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 5/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/27/2020. (SWM) (Main Document 18 replaced on 4/27/2020) (SWM).
April 24, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to May 22, 2020 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant THE MAD CRAB LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drake, John)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Parties' #15 Joint Motion to Continue Deadlines and Initial Pretrial Conference. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the April 27, 2020 initial pretrial conference is CONTINUED to June 3, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern). The proposed case management plan is due May 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/16/2020.(SWM)
April 15, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Deadlines and Initial Pretrial Conference, filed by Defendant THE MAD CRAB LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drake, John)
April 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 Exhibit) (JDC)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2020 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the courts expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/30/2020.(SWM)
March 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant THE MAD CRAB LLC. (Drake, John)
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE MAD CRAB LLC. (Drake, John)
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Drake on behalf of Defendant THE MAD CRAB LLC. (Drake, John)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Exs. A-I, Appearance and Pro Hac Vice, Corporate Disclosures, and Magistrate Notice served on Jin Rong Dong on 03/06/2020, filed by BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC. (Klein, Steven)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Steven E. Klein for BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Steven E. Klein register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by March 19, 2020. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Steven E. Klein via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/6/2020. (SWM)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to THE MAD CRAB LLC. (REO)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC identifying Corporate Parent SINHDARELLA, INC., Corporate Parent RED CRAWFISH, INC for BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC.. (Guevara, Gregory)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven E. Klein to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5890494), filed by Plaintiff BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Steven E. Klein, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guevara, Gregory)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip R. Zimmerly on behalf of Plaintiff BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC. (Zimmerly, Philip)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory W. Guevara on behalf of Plaintiff BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC. (Guevara, Gregory)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5890426) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - TBC Exteriors, #2 Exhibit B - TBC Interiors, #3 Exhibit C - TBC Menus, #4 Exhibit D - TBC Collateral, #5 Exhibit E - TBC Website, #6 Exhibit F - TBC Registrations, #7 Exhibit G - Infringing Marks, #8 Exhibit H - Infringing Menu, #9 Exhibit I - Infringing Trade Dress, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Proposed Summons)(Guevara, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC v. THE MAD CRAB LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOILING CRAB FRANCHISE CO., LLC
Represented By: Gregory W. Guevara
Represented By: Philip R. Zimmerly
Represented By: Steven E. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE MAD CRAB LLC
Represented By: John A. Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?