PULLINS v. INDIANAPOLIS RECORDER CHARITIES INC.
Plaintiff: PIERRE Q. PULLINS
Defendant: INDIANAPOLIS RECORDER CHARITIES INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01221
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Regarding the request to consolidate this matter with Case Number 1:20-cv-01313-JRS-DLP, Mr. Pullins makes no specific argument as to why consolidation would be appropriate. Furthermore, Mr. Pullins has not yet complied with the April 23 Order and, therefore, has not yet filed a viable complaint demonstrating that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Accordingly, Mr. Pullins's Motion to Consolidate Civil Actions, #7 , is DENIED without prejudice. His Motions for Extension of Time, #7 , and Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint, #9 , are GRANTED and Mr. Pullins shall have until July 8, 2020 to: (1) file an Amended Complaint establishing a basis for this Court's jurisdiction; and (2) either pay the filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed without paying the filing fee using the forms previously sent to him along with the April 23 Order. Failure to complete these actions by the deadline may result in dismissal of this case. (See Order) Copy to Pierre Q. Pullins via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/17/2020. (JDH)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 Docket #2 and #3 resent to Plaintiff PIERRE Q. PULLINS at 6120 Westlake Dr. NApt. B Indianapolis, IN 46224 based on Order at Dkt. #6 .(TMC)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff PIERRE Q. PULLINS. (JDH)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by PIERRE Q. PULLINS. (JDH)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff PIERRE Q. PULLINS. (JDH)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - On April 23, 2020, the Court entered an Order directing Plaintiff Pierre Pullins to either pay the $400 filing fee or file a Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Filing Fee, and also to file an Amended Complaint, by May 22, 2020. [Filing No. 3.] From a review of the docket, the Court has determined that the Order was inadvertently sent to Mr. Pullins at an incorrect address. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to correct the address on the docket for Mr. Pullins to: 6120 Westlake Drive N., Apt. B, Indianapolis, IN 46224, and to RE-SEND the Court's April 23, 2020 Order, [Filing No. 3], to Mr. Pullins at that address. Additionally, the Court ORDERS that Mr. Pullins may have until May 29, 2020 to comply with the requirements set forth in the April 23, 2020 Order. Copies to Pierre Q. Pullins via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/6/2020.(JDH)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #2 Magistrate Judge's Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction sent to PIERRE Q. PULLINS at 5120 Westlake Dr. N, Apt. B, Indianapolis, IN 46224. (JDH)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #3 Order sent to PIERRE Q. PULLINS at 5120 Westlake Dr. N, Apt. B, Indianapolis, IN 46224. (JDH)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The Court ORDERS Mr. Pullins to file an Amended Complaint by May 22, 2020, which addresses the issue outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Court's subject matter jurisdiction. Defendant need not answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint at which this Order is directed. Defendant is cautioned, however, that when it does respond to the Amended Complaint, and to the extent that it denies any of Mr. Pullins' jurisdictional allegations or states that it does not have sufficient information to respond to those allegations, the Court will require the parties to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement confirming that all parties are in agreement with the underlying jurisdictional allegations before the litigation moves forward. Failure to pay the $400.00 filing fee or file a Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Filing Fee and failure to file an Amended Complaint by May 22, 2020 may result in dismissal of this case. (See Order). Copy to Pierre Q. Pullins via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Form - Motion in forma pauperis, #2 Form - Complaint)(JDH)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INDIANAPOLIS RECORDER CHARITIES INC., filed by PIERRE Q. PULLINS. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PULLINS v. INDIANAPOLIS RECORDER CHARITIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PIERRE Q. PULLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANAPOLIS RECORDER CHARITIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?