TULLY et al v. OKESON et al
Plaintiff: DOMINIC TUMMINELLO, KATHERINE PAOLACCI, SHELLY BROWN, MARC BLACK, JANICE JOHNSON, DAVID SLIVKA, DAVID CARTER, REBECCA GAINES, ELIZABETH KMIECIAK, INDIANA VOTE BY MAIL, INC., CHAQUITTA MCCLEARY, KATHARINE BLACK and BARBARA TULLY
Defendant: S. ANTHONY LONG, PAUL OKESON, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT and CONNIE LAWSON
Case Number: 1:2020cv01271
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SCHEDULING ORDER - The parties appeared by counsel telephonically for a telephonic status conference on June 18, 2020 pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure regarding the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Dkt. [ #13 ]. The Court establishes the following schedule to prepare this matter for a hearing on that motion (see Order for established deadlines and addition details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/22/2020.(SWM)
June 18, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Garn, Jefferson)
June 16, 2020 Filing 20 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiffs KATHARINE BLACK, MARC BLACK, SHELLY BROWN, DAVID CARTER, REBECCA GAINES, INDIANA VOTE BY MAIL, INC., JANICE JOHNSON, ELIZABETH KMIECIAK, CHAQUITTA MCCLEARY, KATHERINE PAOLACCI, DAVID SLIVKA, BARBARA TULLY, DOMINIC TUMMINELLO . (Sniderman, Mark)
June 16, 2020 Filing 18 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Plaintiffs KATHARINE BLACK, MARC BLACK, SHELLY BROWN, DAVID CARTER, REBECCA GAINES, INDIANA VOTE BY MAIL, INC., JANICE JOHNSON, ELIZABETH KMIECIAK, CHAQUITTA MCCLEARY, KATHERINE PAOLACCI, DAVID SLIVKA, BARBARA TULLY, DOMINIC TUMMINELLO. (Sniderman, Mark)
June 16, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Plaintiffs KATHARINE BLACK, MARC BLACK, SHELLY BROWN, DAVID CARTER, REBECCA GAINES, INDIANA VOTE BY MAIL, INC., JANICE JOHNSON, ELIZABETH KMIECIAK, CHAQUITTA MCCLEARY, KATHERINE PAOLACCI, DAVID SLIVKA, BARBARA TULLY, DOMINIC TUMMINELLO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of William R. Groth, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Mark W. Sniderman)(Sniderman, Mark)
June 12, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Parvinder Kaur Nijjar on behalf of Defendants ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (Nijjar, Parvinder)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 6/18/2020 at 3:30 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The purpose of the conference is to discuss a briefing schedule regarding the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #13 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/9/2020.(CBU)
June 8, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs KATHARINE BLACK, MARC BLACK, SHELLY BROWN, DAVID CARTER, REBECCA GAINES, INDIANA VOTE BY MAIL, INC., JANICE JOHNSON, ELIZABETH KMIECIAK, CHAQUITTA MCCLEARY, KATHERINE PAOLACCI, DAVID SLIVKA, BARBARA TULLY, DOMINIC TUMMINELLO. (Sniderman, Mark)
June 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs KATHARINE BLACK, MARC BLACK, SHELLY BROWN, DAVID CARTER, REBECCA GAINES, INDIANA VOTE BY MAIL, INC., JANICE JOHNSON, ELIZABETH KMIECIAK, CHAQUITTA MCCLEARY, KATHERINE PAOLACCI, DAVID SLIVKA, BARBARA TULLY, DOMINIC TUMMINELLO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Barbara Tully, #2 Exhibit Declaration of David Carter, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Elizabeth Kmieciak, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Janice Johnson, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Marc Black, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Katharine Black, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Shelly Brown, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Chaquitta McCreary, #9 Exhibit Declaration of Dominic Tumminello, #10 Exhibit Declaration of Rebecca Gaines, #11 Exhibit Declaration of Katherine Paolacci, #12 Exhibit Declaration of David Slivka, #13 Exhibit Declaration of Jeffrey G. Jones, M.D., M.P.H., #14 Exhibit Declaration of Gregory Shufeldt, Ph.D.)(Sniderman, Mark)
May 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (Garn, Jefferson)
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by All Plaintiffs. ZACHARY E. KLUTZ served on 5/4/2020; CONNIE LAWSON served on 5/4/2020; S. ANTHONY LONG served on 5/4/2020; PAUL OKESON served on 5/4/2020; SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT served on 5/4/2020. (Groth, William)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2020 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/11/2020.(SWM)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Lyn Abshire on behalf of Defendants ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (Abshire, Courtney)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jefferson S. Garn on behalf of Defendants ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (Garn, Jefferson)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs KATHARINE BLACK, MARC BLACK, SHELLY BROWN, DAVID CARTER, REBECCA GAINES, INDIANA VOTE BY MAIL, INC., JANICE JOHNSON, ELIZABETH KMIECIAK, CHAQUITTA MCCLEARY, KATHERINE PAOLACCI, DAVID SLIVKA, BARBARA TULLY, DOMINIC TUMMINELLO, re #6 Amended Complaint. (Sniderman, Mark)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Sniderman, Mark)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (REO)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Groth on behalf of Plaintiffs KATHARINE BLACK, MARC BLACK, SHELLY BROWN, DAVID CARTER, REBECCA GAINES, INDIANA VOTE BY MAIL, INC., JANICE JOHNSON, ELIZABETH KMIECIAK, CHAQUITTA MCCLEARY, KATHERINE PAOLACCI, DAVID SLIVKA, BARBARA TULLY, DOMINIC TUMMINELLO. (Groth, William)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Sniderman on behalf of Plaintiffs KATHARINE BLACK, MARC BLACK, SHELLY BROWN, DAVID CARTER, REBECCA GAINES, INDIANA VOTE BY MAIL, INC., JANICE JOHNSON, ELIZABETH KMIECIAK, CHAQUITTA MCCLEARY, KATHERINE PAOLACCI, DAVID SLIVKA, BARBARA TULLY, DOMINIC TUMMINELLO. (Sniderman, Mark)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5973629) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Sniderman, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TULLY et al v. OKESON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINIC TUMMINELLO
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERINE PAOLACCI
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELLY BROWN
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARC BLACK
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE JOHNSON
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID SLIVKA
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID CARTER
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA GAINES
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH KMIECIAK
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA VOTE BY MAIL, INC.
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAQUITTA MCCLEARY
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHARINE BLACK
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA TULLY
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. ANTHONY LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL OKESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZACHARY E. KLUTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE LAWSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?