WATKINS et al v. KNIGHT et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY M. WATKINS
Defendant: I.D.O.C., STANLEY KNIGHT, ERIC HOLCOMB and WEXFORD HEALTH SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2020cv01673
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING CLERK TO MAINTAIN DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL - Anthony Watkins' motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #5 , is granted to the extent that he is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Four Dollars and Six Cents ($4.06). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Mr. Watkins shall have through August 21, 2020, to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Mr. Watkins is informed that after the initial partial filing fee is paid, he will be obligated to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income each month that the amount in his account exceeds $10.00, until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). After the initial partial filing fee is received, a collection order will be issued to the plaintiff and the plaintiff's custodian. The clerk is directed to maintain the motion, dkt. #5 , under seal because it identifies a minor child by name. Copy to Anthony M. Watkins via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 7/16/2020. (JDH)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY M. WATKINS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Trust Statement, #2 Envelope)(JDH) Modified on 7/16/2020 (JDH).
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through July 27, 2020, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ERIC HOLCOMB, I.D.O.C., STANLEY KNIGHT, WEXFORD HEALTH SERVICES, filed by ANTHONY M. WATKINS. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope), (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WATKINS et al v. KNIGHT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY M. WATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.D.O.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANLEY KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC HOLCOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEXFORD HEALTH SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?