AXIA HOLDINGS, LLC v. LYNDA J. GREENE et al
Plaintiff: AXIA HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: LYNDA J. GREENE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, JOHN DOE/MARY DOE AS UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS and THE DEVISEES OF THE ESTATE OF LUCY J. BLUNT
Case Number: 1:2020cv01716
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Home Equity Conversion Mortgage, #2 Exhibit 2 - Assignment to HUD, #3 Exhibit 3 - Certificate of Indebtedness, #4 Exhibit 4 - Home Equity Conversion Second Mortgage)(Shields, Gina)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendant USA's #9 Motion to Vacate Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Initial Pretrial Conference set in this matter for July 31, 2020, and all related deadlines, including the submission of a case management plan [see Filing No. #6 ], are VACATED. Copies via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 7/21/2020.(SWM) Modified on 7/22/2020 (SWM).
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Vacate #6 Scheduling Order , filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shields, Gina)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to AXIA HOLDINGS, LLC. (RAGS) (DWH)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2020 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/30/2020.(SWM)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting USA's #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 7/27/2020. Copies via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/26/2020. (SWM)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 27, 2020 in which to #1 Notice of Removal , filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shields, Gina)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina M. Shields on behalf of Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Shields, Gina)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Circuit Court, case number 49C01-2004-PL-014353, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record appearance, complaint, praecipe, affidavit, notice of suit, summonses, returns of service, proof of publication, #2 Complaint to Quiet Title Real Estate, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shields, Gina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AXIA HOLDINGS, LLC v. LYNDA J. GREENE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNDA J. GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Represented By: Gina M. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE/MARY DOE AS UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE DEVISEES OF THE ESTATE OF LUCY J. BLUNT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXIA HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Jynell D. Berkshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?